EP2251979 - Method and driver switch for operating a semiconductor voltage switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMA Solar Technology AG Sonnenallee 1 34266 Niestetal / DE | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prior, Oliver Kasseler Strasse 90a 34431, Marsberg / DE | 02 /
Strubel, Tobias Helmholtzstrasse 9a 34127, Kassel / DE | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09159930.8 | 11.05.2009 | [2010/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251979 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/16, H02M1/08, // H03K17/04, H03K17/0412 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
H03K17/162 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (EP,US);
H03K17/168 (EP,US);
H03K17/0406 (EP,US);
H03K17/04123 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Treiberschaltung zum Treiben eines Halbleiterleistungsschalters | [2010/46] | English: | Method and driver switch for operating a semiconductor voltage switch | [2010/46] | French: | Procédé et circuit d'excitation destinés à exciter un disjoncteur semi-conducteur | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/49] | 29.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2004257155 (MCEWEN THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1-3,6,10-11 * the whole document * [A] 12-15 [I] 4-5,7-9 | by applicant | DE3718001 |