EP2120164 - Unified media file architecture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo ON N2L 3W8 / CA | ||
Former [2009/47] | For all designated states Research In Motion Limited 295 Phillip Street Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas, Edward E. 295 Phillip Street Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 02 /
Mc Sheffrey, Grant 295 Phillip Street Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | 03 /
Agampodi, Thusha 295 Phillip Street Waterloo Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Greenaway, Martin William, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Terry, Martin Albert Mortimer, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09160028.8 | 12.05.2009 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | US20080052633P | 12.05.2008 Original published format: US 52633 P | US20080052640P | 12.05.2008 Original published format: US 52640 P | US20080127813P | 14.05.2008 Original published format: US 127813 P | US20080127796P | 14.05.2008 Original published format: US 127796 P | US20080177112 | 21.07.2008 Original published format: US 177112 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120164 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
G06F16/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einheitliche Mediendateistruktur | [2009/47] | English: | Unified media file architecture | [2009/47] | French: | Architecture unifiée de fichiers de média | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 13.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 11.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 11.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02075539 (NOVELL INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 1 - page 27 *; | [A]US2004205638 (THOMAS WEISE [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1 - column 30 *; | [A]US2006069998 (ARTMAN TUOMAS [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1 - column 22 *; | [A]US2007198602 (NGO DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-15* column 1 - column 22 *; | [X]WO2008008448 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1 - page 25 *; | [X] - PEERY C ET AL, "Wayfinder: navigating and sharing information in a decentralized world", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN; DE, (20040101), vol. 3367, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 200 - 214, XP002481243 [X] 1-15 * page 200 - page 212 * |