EP2251807 - Computer system to improve the control of access to data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.10.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METADAT IT-Beratungs- und Entwicklungs-GmbH Simmeringer Hauptstrasse 24 1110 Wien / AT | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kotsch, Leszek Wiedner Hauptstrasse 146/2/21 1040 Wien / AT | 02 /
Hoffmann, Harald Nibelungengasse 8 1010 Wien / AT | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | Müllner, Martin Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr. Martin Müllner Postfach 169 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/46] | Müllner, Martin Patentanwälte Dr. Erwin Müllner Dipl.-Ing. Werner Katschinka Dr. Martin Müllner Weihburggasse 9, Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 09160314.2 | 14.05.2009 | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2251807 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F21/00 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G06F21/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/46] | Title | German: | Computersystem zur verbesserten Kontrolle des Zugriffes auf Daten | [2010/46] | English: | Computer system to improve the control of access to data | [2010/46] | French: | Système informatique pour améliorer le contrôle d'accès aux données | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/25] | 16.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.10.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/48] | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]WO2007078648 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [XD] 1-11 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0035] *; | [AD]EP1669833 (MOBILEGOV FRANCE S A R L [FR]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004148478 (LEUNG KWOK-YAN [CA]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003225960 (GUU MORRIS [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1182534 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1063580 (INT GAME TECH [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2007078648 | EP1669833 |