04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
27.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
13.09.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] |
24.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
15.02.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
13.04.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.05.2012 [2012/20] |
30.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.02.2012 [2012/05] |
02.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.10.2011 [2011/40] |
29.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
29.07.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
24.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
17.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] |
10.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] |
03.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] |
27.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2011 [2011/26] |
20.08.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
09.08.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
09.08.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.04.2010 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.04.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.04.2010 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
09.04.2010 |
Change - French title |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
06.04.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.02.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
23.10.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
23.10.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] |
23.10.2009 |
First examination report |
|
02.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|