EP2123876 - Exhaust emission controll system for internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kashima, Soji c/o Honda R & D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome, Wako-shi Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Prechtel, Jörg Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09160395.1 | 15.05.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | JP20080131300 | 19.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008131300 | [2009/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2123876 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2123876 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/22, F01N3/34, F01L13/08, F02D13/02 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
F01N3/22 (EP,US);
F01L13/08 (EP,US);
F01L13/085 (EP,US);
F01N3/34 (EP,US);
F02D13/0246 (EP,US);
F02D13/0273 (EP,US);
F02D13/04 (EP,US);
F02M26/01 (EP,US);
F01N2430/10 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | Abgasemissions-Steuerungssystem für eine Brennkraftmaschine | [2009/48] | English: | Exhaust emission controll system for internal combustion engine | [2009/48] | French: | Système de commande d'émission de gaz d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne | [2010/19] |
Former [2009/48] | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'ÉMISSION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | Examination procedure | 15.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 08.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2010 | BE | 22.09.2010 | CY | 22.09.2010 | CZ | 22.09.2010 | DK | 22.09.2010 | EE | 22.09.2010 | FI | 22.09.2010 | HR | 22.09.2010 | HU | 22.09.2010 | LT | 22.09.2010 | LV | 22.09.2010 | MK | 22.09.2010 | MT | 22.09.2010 | NL | 22.09.2010 | PL | 22.09.2010 | RO | 22.09.2010 | SE | 22.09.2010 | SI | 22.09.2010 | SK | 22.09.2010 | TR | 22.09.2010 | BG | 22.12.2010 | NO | 22.12.2010 | GR | 23.12.2010 | ES | 02.01.2011 | IS | 22.01.2011 | PT | 24.01.2011 | IE | 15.05.2011 | LU | 15.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
TR | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
LU | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
BG | 22.12.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
LU | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CY | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
LU | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
LU | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MK | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
IE | 15.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
MT | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
DK | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
ES | 02.01.2011 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/27] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
BE | 22.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/26] | AT | 22.09.2010 | |
CZ | 22.09.2010 | ||
EE | 22.09.2010 | ||
FI | 22.09.2010 | ||
HR | 22.09.2010 | ||
LT | 22.09.2010 | ||
LV | 22.09.2010 | ||
NL | 22.09.2010 | ||
PL | 22.09.2010 | ||
RO | 22.09.2010 | ||
SE | 22.09.2010 | ||
SI | 22.09.2010 | ||
SK | 22.09.2010 | ||
NO | 22.12.2010 | ||
GR | 23.12.2010 | ||
IS | 22.01.2011 | ||
PT | 24.01.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2640941 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1* figure 1; claim 11 *; | [X]FR2687730 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 22 - page 9, line 33; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]JP2006329003 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2535339B | JP2005240793 |