EP2120080 - A method and system for controlling the position of a microscope lens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FFEI Limited Graphics House Boundary Way Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP2 7SU / GB | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hawes, William Roland / 3 Herbert Street Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP2 5HP / GB | 02 /
Bromley, Nigel Ingram 24 Burghley Court Great Holm Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK8 9EL / GB | [2011/40] |
Former [2009/47] | 01 /
Hawes, William Roland 3 Herbert Street Hemel Hempstead Hertfordshire HP2 5HP / GB | ||
02 /
Bromley, Nigel Ingram 24 Burghley Court Great Holm Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK8 9EL / GB | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/40] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 09160403.3 | 15.05.2009 | [2009/47] | Priority number, date | US20080121830 | 16.05.2008 Original published format: US 121830 | [2009/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120080 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2120080 | Date: | 05.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/24 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
G02B21/241 (EP,US);
G02B21/367 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Steuerung der Position eines Mikroskopobjektivs | [2009/47] | English: | A method and system for controlling the position of a microscope lens | [2009/47] | French: | Procédé et système de contrôle de la position d'une lentille de microscope | [2009/47] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 06.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2009 | AT | 05.10.2011 | BE | 05.10.2011 | CY | 05.10.2011 | CZ | 05.10.2011 | DK | 05.10.2011 | EE | 05.10.2011 | FI | 05.10.2011 | HR | 05.10.2011 | IT | 05.10.2011 | LT | 05.10.2011 | LV | 05.10.2011 | MK | 05.10.2011 | MT | 05.10.2011 | NL | 05.10.2011 | PL | 05.10.2011 | RO | 05.10.2011 | SE | 05.10.2011 | SI | 05.10.2011 | SK | 05.10.2011 | TR | 05.10.2011 | BG | 05.01.2012 | NO | 05.01.2012 | GR | 06.01.2012 | ES | 16.01.2012 | IS | 05.02.2012 | PT | 06.02.2012 | IE | 15.05.2012 | LU | 15.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
LU | 15.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
TR | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
MT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
FI | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
ES | 16.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
IE | 15.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
MK | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 05.10.2011 | |
BE | 05.10.2011 | ||
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
IT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
PL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
RO | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
SK | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
DK | 05.10.2011 | ||
EE | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
BG | 05.01.2012 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
CY | 05.10.2011 | ||
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
HR | 05.10.2011 | ||
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
LV | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SE | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
NL | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
GR | 06.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
PT | 06.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 05.10.2011 | |
LT | 05.10.2011 | ||
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
IS | 05.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 05.10.2011 | |
SI | 05.10.2011 | ||
NO | 05.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/14] | SI | 05.10.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE19702752 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003089845 (WIDZGOWSKI BERND [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1389868 (ZEISS OPTRONIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]EP1617250 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0012] * [Y] 2-7,9-15; | [Y]DE102005047200 (ZEISS CARL JENA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2-7,9-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0086] * | by applicant | DE19702752 | EP1617250 |