EP2123954 - Tap/mixer unit for water systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr Thermot-tronik Italia S.P.A. Via A. Doria, 15 10123 Torino / IT | For all designated states Equa S.r.l. Via A.M. Pattoni, 29 28883 Gravellona Toce (VB) / IT | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Triberti, Franco Via Alpignano, 10 10098 Rivoli (TO) / IT | 02 /
Ciana, Giulio Strada Jegar, 31 28877 Ornavasso (VB) / IT | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Buzzi, Franco c/o Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 09160598.0 | 19.05.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | IT2008TO00376 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: IT TO20080376 | [2009/48] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2123954 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2123954 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F16K11/00 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
F16K19/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | F16K11/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | Hahn- / Mischeinheit für Wassersysteme | [2009/48] | English: | Tap/mixer unit for water systems | [2009/48] | French: | Unité de robinet/mixeur pour systèmes d'eau | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 11.04.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP0381285 (TEUCO GUZZINI SRL [IT]) [I] 1-6,8,11,12 * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 14; figure 3 * [A] 7,9,10,13; | [A]DE202006017900U (HIDDE AXEL R [DE]; KLOSE ODO [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0067] - [0072]; figure 2 *; | [A]EP1840427 (AQUALISA PRODUCTS LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0080] - [0085]; figure 1 * |