EP2124313 - Charge-Controlling Semiconductor Integrated Circuit and Charging Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Yoshihiro c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Daisuke c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | 03 /
Motoichi, Yoshihiro c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | 04 /
Kurokawa, Gentaro c/o Mitsumi Electric Co., Ltd. 2-11-2, Tsurumaki Tama-shi Tokyo 206-8567 / JP | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09160625.1 | 19.05.2009 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | JP20080131754 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008131754 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2124313 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
H02J7/00 (EP,KR,US);
G05F1/56 (KR);
H02M3/155 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | Ladungssteuernde integrierte Halbleiterschaltung und Ladungsvorrichtung | [2009/48] | English: | Charge-Controlling Semiconductor Integrated Circuit and Charging Apparatus | [2009/48] | French: | Circuit intégré semi-conducteur contrôlant la charge et appareil de chargement | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2004213697 | JP2004280704 |