EP2127815 - Fastener driving tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | For all designated states Black & Decker, Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, DE 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kunz, Michael Rosenstrasse 4 65599 Dorndorf / DE | 02 /
Gensmann, Stefan In den Wiesen 4 56132 Frücht / DE | 03 /
Rompel, Markus Im Valler 13 65594 Runkel / DE | [2009/49] | Representative(s) | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Bell, Ian Stephen, et al Black & Decker Patent Department 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 09160730.9 | 20.05.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | GB20080009870 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: GB 0809870 | GB20080011155 | 18.06.2008 Original published format: GB 0811155 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2127815 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B25C1/00, B25C5/16 | [2009/49] | CPC: |
B25C5/1665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/49] | Title | German: | Werkzeug zum Antreiben von Befestigungselementen | [2009/49] | English: | Fastener driving tool | [2009/49] | French: | Outil entraînant une attache | [2009/49] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/28] | 16.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005023323 (JALBERT DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-15 * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042]; figures 5,9,14 * [Y] 6; | [YA]US2006169735 (WEN MING-HAN [TW]) [Y] 6 * figure - * [A] 7-15; | [AD]US3606128 (CAST ADOLF, et al) [AD] 1,6 * figures 6-9 *; | [A]EP1862262 (HILTI AG [LI]) [A] 1-2,7-15 * figure - * |