EP2146352 - Storage rack for storing nuclear fuel assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCI AG Im Link 11 8404 Winterthur / CH | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kielbowicz, Stanislaw Muslistrasse 10 8820 Wädenswil / CH | [2014/02] |
Former [2010/03] | 01 /
Kielbowicz, Stanislaw Muslistrasse 10 8820 Wädenswil / CH | Representative(s) | Schmidtchen, Jürgen Christian, et al Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/50] | Schmidtchen, Jürgen Christian, et al Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/03] | Sulzer Management AG Patentabteilung / 0067 Zürcherstrasse 14 8401 Winterthur / CH | Application number, filing date | 09160836.4 | 20.05.2009 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | EP20080158613 | 19.06.2008 Original published format: EP 08158613 | [2010/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2146352 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2146352 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G21C19/07 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G21C19/07 (EP,KR);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | Lagergestell zum Lagern nuklearer Brennelemente | [2010/03] | English: | Storage rack for storing nuclear fuel assemblies | [2010/03] | French: | Râtelier de stockage pour assemblages de combustible nucléaire | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 17.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2010 | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2009 | BG | 08.01.2014 | CY | 08.01.2014 | CZ | 08.01.2014 | DK | 08.01.2014 | EE | 08.01.2014 | ES | 08.01.2014 | FI | 08.01.2014 | HR | 08.01.2014 | IT | 08.01.2014 | LT | 08.01.2014 | LV | 08.01.2014 | MC | 08.01.2014 | MK | 08.01.2014 | MT | 08.01.2014 | NL | 08.01.2014 | PL | 08.01.2014 | RO | 08.01.2014 | SE | 08.01.2014 | SI | 08.01.2014 | SK | 08.01.2014 | TR | 08.01.2014 | NO | 08.04.2014 | GR | 09.04.2014 | IS | 08.05.2014 | PT | 08.05.2014 | AT | 20.05.2014 | GB | 20.05.2014 | IE | 20.05.2014 | LU | 20.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | FR | 02.06.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 20.05.2009 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
TR | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 20.05.2009 | |
BG | 08.01.2014 | ||
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
IT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 08.01.2014 | |
CY | 08.01.2014 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
GR | 09.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
MT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
AT | 20.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SI | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
GB | 20.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
IE | 20.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
MC | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
LU | 20.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
PL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
SK | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
RO | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
CZ | 08.01.2014 | ||
DK | 08.01.2014 | ||
EE | 08.01.2014 | ||
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
HR | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
LV | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
NL | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 08.01.2014 | |
ES | 08.01.2014 | ||
FI | 08.01.2014 | ||
LT | 08.01.2014 | ||
SE | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | ||
PT | 08.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 08.01.2014 | |
NO | 08.04.2014 | ||
IS | 08.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0385186 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 44; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US4029968 (RUBINSTEIN HERBERT J, et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 18; figures 3-5 *; | [A]WO8000046 (SULZER AG [CH], et al) [A] 1,5,8-12 * abstract * * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 23; figures 3,4 *; | [A]FR2433809 (SULZER AG [CH]) [A] 1-3,6,8,9 * page 7, line 13 - line 21; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]US5361281 (POROWSKI JAN S [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 4, line 37 - line 43 * * column 6, line 22 - line 34; figures 3,12,17 *; | [DA]DE2930237 (BABCOCK BROWN BOVERI REAKTOR) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]US4042828 (RUBINSTEIN HERBERT J, et al) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [DA]EP0759623 (SULZER THERMTEC AG [CH]) [DA] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0385186 | US4029968 | WO8000046 | FR2433809 | US5361281 | DE2930237 | US4042828 | EP0759623 |