EP2128433 - Foundation comprising a fixture for locating wind turbine equipment on the foundation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/49] | Fixture for locating wind turbine equipment on foundation prior to tower installation | ||
[2016/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2009/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lyness, Thomas E. 413 Hudson Farm Road Greer, SC 29650 / US | [2016/32] |
Former [2009/49] | 01 /
Lyness, Thomas E. 413 Hudson Farm Road Greer, SC 29650 / US | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2016/32] |
Former [2009/49] | Bedford, Grant Richard London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09161179.8 | 26.05.2009 | [2009/49] | Priority number, date | US20080130042 | 30.05.2008 Original published format: US 130042 | [2009/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2128433 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2128433 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2128433 | Date: | 10.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/00, F03D13/20, F03D80/80 | [2016/16] | CPC: |
F03D13/20 (EP,KR,US);
E04H14/00 (KR);
F03D13/10 (EP,US);
F03D13/22 (EP,KR,US);
F03D80/82 (EP,US);
F03D80/85 (EP,US);
F03D80/88 (EP,US);
F05B2230/608 (EP,US);
F05B2250/33 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/49] | F03D1/00, F03D11/00, F03D11/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/32] |
Former [2009/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fundament mit Vorrichtung zur Platzierung von Windturbinenausrüstung auf dem Fundament | [2016/16] | English: | Foundation comprising a fixture for locating wind turbine equipment on the foundation | [2016/16] | French: | Fondation comprenant un dispositif pour le positionnement d'équipement d'éolienne | [2016/16] |
Former [2009/49] | Armatur zur Plazierung von Windturbinenausrüstung vor der installation des Turms | ||
Former [2009/49] | Fixture for locating wind turbine equipment on foundation prior to tower installation | ||
Former [2009/49] | Armature pour positionnement d'équipement d'éolienne avant installation de la tour | Examination procedure | 03.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 21.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2009 | AT | 10.08.2016 | BE | 10.08.2016 | CY | 10.08.2016 | CZ | 10.08.2016 | EE | 10.08.2016 | FI | 10.08.2016 | HR | 10.08.2016 | IT | 10.08.2016 | LT | 10.08.2016 | LV | 10.08.2016 | MC | 10.08.2016 | MK | 10.08.2016 | NL | 10.08.2016 | PL | 10.08.2016 | RO | 10.08.2016 | SE | 10.08.2016 | SI | 10.08.2016 | SK | 10.08.2016 | BG | 10.11.2016 | NO | 10.11.2016 | GR | 11.11.2016 | IS | 10.12.2016 | PT | 12.12.2016 | [2019/52] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 26.05.2009 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CY | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 26.05.2009 | |
AT | 10.08.2016 | ||
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
MC | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SI | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
BE | 10.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 10.08.2016 | ||
EE | 10.08.2016 | ||
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
RO | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
SK | 10.08.2016 | ||
BG | 10.11.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LV | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 10.08.2016 | |
FI | 10.08.2016 | ||
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
GR | 11.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
PT | 12.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
HR | 10.08.2016 | ||
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
PL | 10.08.2016 | ||
SE | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
IS | 10.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 10.08.2016 | |
IT | 10.08.2016 | ||
LT | 10.08.2016 | ||
NL | 10.08.2016 | ||
NO | 10.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 10.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006056196 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8 * figure 10 * * page 17, line 13 - line 17 * [I] 4,7,9,10; | [XI]US2004131467 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1,5,6,8,9 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0016] * [I] 2-4,7,10; | [X]US2005072067 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1-10 * figures 7, 10, 12, 13 * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0056] * |