Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8667271 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2014 | B2 | US2010017607 | 21.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47447309 | 29.05.2009 | US8092208 | 15.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2146466 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2014 | B1 | EP2146466 | 20.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8092208 | 15.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2667733 | 26.05.2015 | C | CA2667733 | 15.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8092208 | 15.07.2008 |