EP2130753 - Motorcycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/50] | Improved and simplified motorcycle | ||
[2012/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ducati Motor Holding S.p.A. Via A. Cavalieri Ducati 3 40132 Bologna / IT | [2009/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castellani, Fausto DUCATI MOTOR HOLDING S.p.A. Via Cavalieri Ducati, 3 40132, BOLOGNA / IT | 02 /
Jenkins, Alan BEAVERFAST, Ltd Hornets Farm , Padbury Road Thornborough Buckingham, Buckinghamshire MK18 2EB / GB | 03 /
Preziosi, Filippo DUCATI MOTOR HOLDING S.p.A. Via A. Cavalieri Ducati, 3 40132, BOLOGNA / IT | 04 /
Strappazzon, Stefano DUCATI MOTOR HOLDING S.p.A. Via A. Cavalieri Ducati, 3 40132, BOLOGNA / IT | 05 /
Uliani, Lorenzo DUCATI MOTOR HOLDING S.p.A. Via A. Cavalieri Ducati, 3 40132, BOLOGNA / IT | [2013/15] |
Former [2009/50] | 01 /
Castellani, Fausto DUCATI MOTOR HOLDING S.p.A. Via Cavalieri Ducati, 3 40132, BOLOGNA / IT | ||
02 /
Jenkins, Alan BEAVERFAST, Ltd Hornets Farm , Padbury Road, Thornborough Buckingham, Buckinghamshire MK18 2EB / GB | |||
03 /
Preziosi, Filippo DUCATI MOTOR HOLDING S.p.A. Via A. Cavalieri Ducati, 3 40132, BOLOGNA / IT | |||
04 /
Strappazzon, Stefano DUCATI MOTOR HOLDING S.p.A. Via A. Cavalieri Ducati, 3 40132, BOLOGNA / IT | |||
05 /
Uliani, Lorenzo DUCATI MOTOR HOLDING S.p.A. Via A. Cavalieri Ducati, 3 40132, BOLOGNA / IT | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [2013/15] |
Former [2009/50] | Ripamonti, Enrico Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09161591.4 | 29.05.2009 | [2009/50] | Priority number, date | IT2008MI01026 | 04.06.2008 Original published format: IT MI20081026 | [2009/50] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2130753 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2130753 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62K11/04, B62K11/06, B62K19/16 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
B62K11/04 (EP,US);
B62K11/06 (EP,US);
B62K19/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | B62K11/04, B62K19/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | Motorrad | [2012/45] | English: | Motorcycle | [2012/45] | French: | Motocyclette | [2012/45] |
Former [2009/50] | Verbessertes und vereinfachtes Motorrad | ||
Former [2009/50] | Improved and simplified motorcycle | ||
Former [2009/50] | Motocyclette simplifiée et améliorée | Examination procedure | 04.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 30.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2009 | AT | 10.04.2013 | BE | 10.04.2013 | CY | 10.04.2013 | CZ | 10.04.2013 | DK | 10.04.2013 | EE | 10.04.2013 | FI | 10.04.2013 | HR | 10.04.2013 | LT | 10.04.2013 | LV | 10.04.2013 | MC | 10.04.2013 | MK | 10.04.2013 | MT | 10.04.2013 | NL | 10.04.2013 | PL | 10.04.2013 | RO | 10.04.2013 | SE | 10.04.2013 | SI | 10.04.2013 | SK | 10.04.2013 | TR | 10.04.2013 | IE | 29.05.2013 | LU | 29.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | BG | 10.07.2013 | NO | 10.07.2013 | GR | 11.07.2013 | ES | 21.07.2013 | IS | 10.08.2013 | PT | 12.08.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MK | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
TR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
MT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
IE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
IE | 29.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
RO | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
SK | 10.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
DK | 10.04.2013 | ||
EE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
MC | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
CY | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
HR | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
LV | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
PL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
BG | 10.07.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
BE | 10.04.2013 | ||
FI | 10.04.2013 | ||
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SE | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
GR | 11.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 10.04.2013 | |
LT | 10.04.2013 | ||
NL | 10.04.2013 | ||
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
ES | 21.07.2013 | ||
IS | 10.08.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 10.04.2013 | |
SI | 10.04.2013 | ||
NO | 10.07.2013 | ||
PT | 12.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 10.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01273777 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X]US4321978 (TOMINAGA NOBUYOSHI, et al) [X] 1-11 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 62; figures 1-6 *; | [A]JPH11208559 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0024]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]JP2005219742 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0028]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | JPH01273777 | US4321978 | JPH11208559 | JP2005219742 |