EP2163150 - Intake device for a chaff cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.11.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2010/11] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstr. 33 33426 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Altepost, Helmut Parkstraße 12 48477, Hörstel-Riesenbeck / DE | 02 /
Rauch, Hans Im Krummeschle 9 88348, Bad Saulgau / DE | [2010/11] | Application number, filing date | 09161651.6 | 02.06.2009 | [2010/11] | Priority number, date | DE20081039863 | 27.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008039863 | [2010/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2163150 | Date: | 17.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2163150 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A01F29/10, A01D43/08 | [2010/11] | CPC: |
A01F29/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2010/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einzugsvorrichtung für einen Feldhäcksler | [2010/11] | English: | Intake device for a chaff cutter | [2010/11] | French: | Dispositif d'insertion pour une ramasseuse-hacheuse | [2010/11] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2009 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/25] | 17.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/50] | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1166619 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0022] * [I] 2-15; | [X]DE2609272 (FAHR AG MASCHF) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * page 6 - page 8 *; | [XDI]EP0519209 (CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH [DE]) [XD] 1 * figure 1 * * column 1 - column 2 * [I] 2-15; | [XDA]DE19539143 (CLAAS OHG [DE]) [XD] 1 * figure 1 * * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 18 * [A] 2-15; | [XDA]DE102005055983 (DEERE & CO [US]) [XD] 1 * figure 2 * * paragraph [0022] * [A] 2-15 | by applicant | EP0519209 | DE19539143 | DE102005055983 |