EP2143777 - Hydrocracking process for producing a fuel containing biofuel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/02] | Hydrocracking method allowing a biofuel to be added to a fuel | ||
[2010/04] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Total Raffinage France 2 place Jean Millier La Défense 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2014/14] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states Total Raffinage Marketing 24 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gueret, Christophe 36 rue Philippe Barrey 76600 Le Havre / FR | 02 /
Patrigeon, Anne 7 impasse Lucien Sampaix 76700 Harfleur / FR | 03 /
Mayeur, Vincent 12 allée Aristide Briand 76330 Notre-Dame-De-Gravenchon / FR | [2010/02] | Representative(s) | Largeau, Béatrice Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | Largeau, Béatrice Cabinet Jolly 54, rue de Clichy 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 09162017.9 | 05.06.2009 | [2010/02] | Priority number, date | FR20080003658 | 30.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0803658 | [2010/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2143777 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C10G3/00, C10G45/02, C10G47/00, C10G65/12, C10L1/02 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
C10L1/023 (EP);
C10G3/46 (EP);
C10G3/50 (EP);
C10G3/54 (EP);
C10G45/02 (EP);
C10G47/00 (EP);
C10G65/12 (EP);
C10G2300/1014 (EP);
C10G2300/1018 (EP);
C10G2300/1055 (EP);
C10G2300/1074 (EP);
C10G2400/04 (EP);
Y02P30/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hydrocracking zur Herstellung eines Brennstoffs mit einem Biobrennstoff | [2010/04] | English: | Hydrocracking process for producing a fuel containing biofuel | [2010/04] | French: | Procédé d'hydrocraquage permettant l'incorporation d'un biocarburant dans un carburant | [2010/02] |
Former [2010/02] | Hydrocrack-Verfahren, das die Beimischung von Biokraftstoff zu einem Kraftstoff ermöglicht | ||
Former [2010/02] | Hydrocracking method allowing a biofuel to be added to a fuel | Examination procedure | 02.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/32] | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/42] | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.08.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1693432 (PETROLEO BRASILEIRO SA [BR]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [I]JP2007153928 (NIPPON OIL CORP) [I] 1-6 * paragraphs [0018] , [0044] , [0055] , [0093] * * example 3 * * table 2 *; | [I]WO2007125332 (PETROLEO BRASILEIRO SA [BR], et al) [I] 1-6 * figure 1 * * page 4, line 33 - page 5, line 5 *; | [I]WO2008012415 (TOTAL FRANCE [FR], et al) [I] 1-6 * claims 10-13 * * page 5, line 12 - line 34 * * the whole document *; | [A]EP1911734 (BP OIL INT [GB]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2910486 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [A] 1-6* the whole document *; | [I] - LANDAU M V ET AL, "Medium severity hydrotreating and hydrocracking of Israeli shale oil - III. Hydrocracking of hydrotreated shale oil and its atmospheric residue for full conversion to motor fuels", FUEL, IPC SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY PRESS, GUILDFORD, GB, (19981101), vol. 77, no. 14, ISSN 0016-2361, pages 1589 - 1597, XP004287107 [I] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-2361(98)00080-5 | Examination | JP2007153928K | by applicant | FR2607803 | US4992605 | US5233109 | US5705722 | SE520633 | EP1693432 |