EP2136080 - Variable displacement compressor with a discharge pressure compensated suction shutoff valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2012/33] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 5052 Troy, Michigan 48007 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bona, Joseph M. / 5000 Meadowbrook Rd. Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | 02 /
Warren, Matthew R. / 85 Goering Ave Buffalo, NY 14225 / US | 03 /
Webster, Douglas E. / 10970 Howe Rd. Clarence, NY 14031 / US | [2012/33] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
Bona, Joseph M. 5000 Meadowbrook Rd. Williamsville, NY 14221 / US | ||
02 /
Warren, Matthew R. 85 Goering Ave Buffalo, NY 14225 / US | |||
03 /
Webster, Douglas E. 10970 Howe Rd. Clarence, NY 14031 / US | Representative(s) | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [2012/33] |
Former [2009/52] | Robert, Vincent, et al Delphi European Headquarters 64, Avenue de la Plaine de France Paris Nord II BP 65059 Tremblay-en-France 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 09162193.8 | 08.06.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | US20080132287P | 17.06.2008 Original published format: US 132287 P | US20090466603 | 15.05.2009 Original published format: US 466603 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136080 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2136080 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/22, F04B27/18 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
F04B27/1804 (EP,US);
F04B49/225 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1872 (EP,US);
F04B2027/1881 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Verstellkompressor mit einem Ansaugsperrventil mit Verdichtungsdruckkompensation | [2009/52] | English: | Variable displacement compressor with a discharge pressure compensated suction shutoff valve | [2009/52] | French: | Compresseur à déplacement variable avec soupape d'arrêt d'aspiration compensée par pression de décharge | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.06.2009 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | HR | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MC | 15.08.2012 | MK | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | NO | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
MK | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MC | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0992684 (TGK CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,8,12 * paragraphs [0032] , [0033] , [0041] - [0047] - [0061] - [0069] * * figures 8,11,13,27-30 *; | [X]EP0881387 (ZEXEL CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * column 5, line 26 - column 6, line 33 * * column 7, line 48 - column 8, line 48 * * column 9, lines 27-55 * * figures 3-5 *; | [X]EP0857874 (SANDEN CORP [JP]) [X] 1,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 53 - column 5, line 11 * * column 6, line 53 - column 9, line 5 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2007013244 (SANDEN CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,12,13 * abstract * * figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP1591661 (TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI KK [JP]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0017] - [0019] , [0024] * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1001170 (TGK CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] , [0029] - [0039] - [0049] * * figures 1-6,17 * | by applicant | US20090372131 |