Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009311528 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0853910 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009298689 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0853910 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2133910 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2013 | B1 | EP2133910 | 16.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0853910 | 12.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2932607 | 14.01.2011 | B1 | FR2932607 | 18.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0853910 | 12.06.2008 |