EP2133910 - Passivation process of non-radiative recombination centres in ZnO samples and so prepared passivated ZnO samples [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/51] | Passivation method of non-radiative recombination centres of ZnO samples and passivated ZnO samples prepared by the same method. | ||
[2012/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.01.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/12] |
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique Bâtiment D "Le Ponant" 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robin, Ivan-Christophe 15 avenue de Vizille 38000, Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Feuillet, Guy Corps d'Uriage 2051 route de Corps 38410, Saint-Martin d'Uriage / FR | [2013/12] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Robin, Ivan-Christophe 15 avenue de Vizille 38000, Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
Feuillet, Guy Corps d'Uriage 2051 route de Corps 38410, Saint-Martin d'Uriage / FR | |||
Former [2010/02] | 01 /
Robin, Ivan-Christophe 15 avenue de Vizille 38100, Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
Feuillet, Guy Corps d'Uriage 2051 route de Corps 38410, Saint-Martin d'Uriage / FR | |||
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
Robin, Ivan-Christophe 7 rue de Belledonne 38100, Grenoble / FR | ||
02 /
Feuillet, Guy Corps d'Uriage 2051 route de Corps 38410, Saint-Martin d'Uriage / FR | Representative(s) | Augarde, Eric, et al Brevalex 56 Boulevard de l'Embouchure Bât. B B.P. 27519 31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | Augarde, Eric, et al BREVALEX 56 Boulevard de l'Embouchure, Bât. B B.P. 27519 31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR | ||
Former [2009/51] | Augarde, Eric, et al Brevalex 56 Boulevard de l'Embouchure, Bât. B B.P. 27519 31075 Toulouse Cedex 2 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09162299.3 | 09.06.2009 | [2009/51] | Priority number, date | FR20080053910 | 12.06.2008 Original published format: FR 0853910 | [2009/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133910 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2133910 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/385, H01L33/00, B82Y40/00, // H01L33/24, H01L33/28, H01L29/06, H01S5/327 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
H01L33/0083 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
H01L21/385 (EP,US);
H01L29/0673 (EP,US);
H01L29/0676 (EP,US);
H01L29/0665 (EP,US);
H01L29/22 (EP,US);
H01L33/18 (EP,US);
H01L33/20 (EP,US);
H01L33/24 (EP,US);
H01S3/169 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2958 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/51] | H01L21/385, H01L33/00, // H01S5/327 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Passivierung der nichtstrahlenden Rekombinationszentren in ZnO-Probenkörpern und so präparierte passivierte ZnO-Probenkörper | [2012/36] | English: | Passivation process of non-radiative recombination centres in ZnO samples and so prepared passivated ZnO samples | [2012/36] | French: | Procédé de passivation des centres de recombinaisons non radiatives d'échantillons en ZnO et échantillons en ZnO passivé ainsi préparés | [2012/36] |
Former [2009/51] | Passivierungsverfahren von nicht-strahlenden Rekombinationszentren von ZnO-Proben und so präparierte passivierte ZnO-Proben | ||
Former [2009/51] | Passivation method of non-radiative recombination centres of ZnO samples and passivated ZnO samples prepared by the same method. | ||
Former [2009/51] | Procédé de passivation des centres de recombinaisons non radiatives d'échantillons en ZnO et échantillons en ZnO passivé ainsi préparés. | Examination procedure | 20.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/26] | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2009 | AT | 20.03.2013 | CY | 20.03.2013 | CZ | 20.03.2013 | DK | 20.03.2013 | EE | 20.03.2013 | FI | 20.03.2013 | HR | 20.03.2013 | IT | 20.03.2013 | LT | 20.03.2013 | LV | 20.03.2013 | MC | 20.03.2013 | MK | 20.03.2013 | MT | 20.03.2013 | NL | 20.03.2013 | PL | 20.03.2013 | RO | 20.03.2013 | SE | 20.03.2013 | SI | 20.03.2013 | SK | 20.03.2013 | TR | 20.03.2013 | IE | 09.06.2013 | LU | 09.06.2013 | BG | 20.06.2013 | NO | 20.06.2013 | GR | 21.06.2013 | BE | 30.06.2013 | CH | 30.06.2013 | LI | 30.06.2013 | ES | 01.07.2013 | IS | 20.07.2013 | PT | 22.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MK | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
TR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
MT | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
IE | 09.06.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
CH | 30.06.2013 | ||
LI | 30.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
BE | 30.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
IT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
DK | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
MC | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CY | 20.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
PL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
CZ | 20.03.2013 | ||
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
RO | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
SK | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 20.03.2013 | |
EE | 20.03.2013 | ||
FI | 20.03.2013 | ||
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
NL | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
IS | 20.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
PT | 22.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
HR | 20.03.2013 | ||
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
LV | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 20.03.2013 | |
LT | 20.03.2013 | ||
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
SI | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
GR | 21.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
ES | 01.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
SE | 20.03.2013 | ||
BG | 20.06.2013 | ||
NO | 20.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 20.03.2013 | |
NO | 20.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004252737 (YI GYU CHUL [KR], et al) [X] 10-14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0006] - [0008] - [0013] - [0015] - [0022] , [0036] - [0041] - [0045]; figures 4,5A,6 *; | [A]EP1677365 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0008] , [0009] , [0011] , [0012] , [0014] , [0016] - [0018] - [0029]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036]; figures 4A-C * * paragraphs [0037] - [0041]; figures 5A-D * * paragraphs [0048] , [0049]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2004232436 (TASI TZONG-LIANG [TW], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] - [0006] - [0009] , [0010] , [0027] , [0031] , [0032]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0046] , [0051]; figure 4 *; | [A] - HWANG C H ET AL, "Novel processing for improving optical property of InGaN/GaN MQW light emitting diode", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (2000), vol. 3938, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 124 - 130, XP002510403 [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 124, line 13 - page 125, line 10 * * page 126, line 3 - page 127, line 1; figures 3-5; table I * * page 127, paragraph CONCLUSION * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.382821 | [A] - SADOFEV S ET AL, "Uniform and efficient UV-emitting ZnO/ZnMgO multiple quantum wells grown by radical-source molecular beam epitaxy", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, PART 2 (LETTERS) JAPAN SOC. APPL. PHYS JAPAN, (200612), vol. 45, no. 46-50, ISSN 0021-4922, pages L1250 - L1252, XP002510404 [A] 10,14 * page L1251, column 1, lines 1-3 * * page L1252, column 2, lines 10-20 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/jjap.45.l1250 | by applicant | - B. PéCZ ET AL., J. APPL. PHYS., (2006), vol. 100, page 103506 | - H. SHIBATA ET AL., APPL. PHYS. LETT., (2007), vol. 90, page 124104 | - D. GERTHSEN ET AL., PHYS. STATUS SOLIDI A, (2000), vol. 177, page 145 |