EP2135499 - Work machine and unloading system for unloading an agricultural product from a work machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coers, Bruce A. / 5016 290th Street North Hillsdale, IL 61257 / US | 02 /
Burke, Daniel J. / 1221 Main Avenue Cordova, IL 61242 / US | 03 /
Mackin, Ryan P. / 8912-27th St. Milan, IL 61264 / US | [2011/41] |
Former [2009/52] | 01 /
Coers, Bruce A. 5016 290th Street North Hillsdale, IL 61257 / US | ||
02 /
Burke, Daniel J. 1221 Main Avenue Cordova, IL 61242 / US | |||
03 /
Mackin, Ryan P. 8912-27th St. Milan, IL 61264 / US | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09162303.3 | 09.06.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | US20080140500 | 17.06.2008 Original published format: US 140500 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2135499 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2135499 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01D41/12, A01F12/46 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
A01D41/1217 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Arbeitsmaschine und Entladesystem zum Entladen eines landwirtschaftlichen Produkts von einer Arbeitsmaschine | [2009/52] | English: | Work machine and unloading system for unloading an agricultural product from a work machine | [2009/52] | French: | Machine de travail et système de déchargement pour décharger un produit agricole d'une machine de travail | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 23.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.06.2009 | AT | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | CZ | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | HR | 12.10.2011 | LT | 12.10.2011 | LV | 12.10.2011 | MK | 12.10.2011 | MT | 12.10.2011 | NL | 12.10.2011 | PL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | NO | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | ES | 23.01.2012 | IS | 12.02.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | IE | 09.06.2012 | LU | 09.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
LU | 09.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
ES | 23.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 09.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MK | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NL | 12.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3670913 (REAVES ROBERT S) [X] 1,7,11 * column 1, lines 47-53; figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,8-10,12; | [XY]US3771676 (RYCZEK W) [X] 1,7,11 * column 2, lines 45-57; figure 1 * [Y] 2,8-10,12; | [A]DE2260920 (CLAAS MASCHF GMBH GEB)[A] 1-12; | [Y]US2002011060 (DILLON BEN N [US]) [Y] 2,8-10,12 * paragraph [0070]; figures 13,14 *; | [Y]US7381131 (HARPOLE DANNY J [US]) [Y] 2,8-10,12 * figures 34,37 * | by applicant | US3771676 | US2002011060 |