|
09.07.2014 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.07.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.06.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.10.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
21.08.2012 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
09.02.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.09.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2010 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.2009 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.10.2009 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.09.2009 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.2009 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |