Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9218547 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2015 | B2 | US2015003745 | 01.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 | US201314018005 | 04.09.2013 | US48737809 | 18.06.2009 | US201414485089 | 12.09.2014 | US201213658319 | 23.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8855429 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2014 | B2 | US2014003726 | 02.01.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 | US201314018005 | 04.09.2013 | US48737809 | 18.06.2009 | US201213658319 | 23.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8553987 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2013 | B2 | US2013044915 | 21.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 | US48737809 | 18.06.2009 | US201213658319 | 23.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10803367 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2020 | B2 | US2020117962 | 16.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 | US201816111967 | 24.08.2018 | US201314018005 | 04.09.2013 | US201916717404 | 17.12.2019 | US48737809 | 18.06.2009 | US201414485089 | 12.09.2014 | US201514969832 | 15.12.2015 | US201213658319 | 23.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10509989 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2019 | B2 | US2018365537 | 20.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 | US201816111967 | 24.08.2018 | US201314018005 | 04.09.2013 | US48737809 | 18.06.2009 | US201414485089 | 12.09.2014 | US201514969832 | 15.12.2015 | US201213658319 | 23.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10089557 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2018 | B2 | US2016098623 | 07.04.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 | US201314018005 | 04.09.2013 | US48737809 | 18.06.2009 | US201414485089 | 12.09.2014 | US201514969832 | 15.12.2015 | US201213658319 | 23.10.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101002899B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2010 | B1 | KR20090132482 | 30.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8320681 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2012 | B2 | US2009316999 | 24.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2136317 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | B1 | EP2136317 | 23.12.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101609505B | 08.05.2013 | B | CN101609505 | 23.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20080058069 | 19.06.2008 | KR20080122637 | 04.12.2008 |