EP2141574 - Mobile terminal using proximity sensor and method of controlling the mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128 Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2017/38] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bong, Byung Eun 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumchun-ku 153-023 Seoul / KR | [2017/14] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
Bong, Byung Eun 327-23 Gasan-dong, Geumchun-ku 153-023 Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/39] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/01] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09162523.6 | 11.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | KR20080063559 | 01.07.2008 Original published format: KR 20080063559 | KR20080063560 | 01.07.2008 Original published format: KR 20080063560 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2141574 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2141574 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2141574 | Date: | 27.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488, G06F3/0482, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0485, G06F3/0486, // H04M1/02, G06F3/044, G06F3/041 | [2017/13] | CPC: |
G06F3/0414 (EP,US);
G06F3/0416 (EP,US);
G06F3/048 (US);
G06F3/0482 (EP,US);
G06F3/0484 (EP,US);
G06F3/0485 (EP,US);
G06F3/0486 (EP,US);
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04808 (EP,US);
G06F3/044 (EP,US);
H04M1/0235 (EP,US);
H04M2250/12 (EP,US);
H04M2250/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/40] | G06F3/048, // H04M1/02, G06F3/044, G06F3/041 | ||
Former IPC [2010/01] | G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2010/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät mit Näherungssensor und Verfahren zur Steuerung des mobilen Endgerätes | [2010/01] | English: | Mobile terminal using proximity sensor and method of controlling the mobile terminal | [2010/01] | French: | Terminal mobile utilisant un capteur de proximité et procédé de contrôle du terminal mobile | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 22.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17184860.9 / EP3258361 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.06.2009 | AT | 27.09.2017 | CY | 27.09.2017 | CZ | 27.09.2017 | DK | 27.09.2017 | EE | 27.09.2017 | ES | 27.09.2017 | FI | 27.09.2017 | HR | 27.09.2017 | IT | 27.09.2017 | LT | 27.09.2017 | LV | 27.09.2017 | MC | 27.09.2017 | MK | 27.09.2017 | NL | 27.09.2017 | PL | 27.09.2017 | PT | 27.09.2017 | RO | 27.09.2017 | SE | 27.09.2017 | SI | 27.09.2017 | SK | 27.09.2017 | TR | 27.09.2017 | BG | 27.12.2017 | NO | 27.12.2017 | GR | 28.12.2017 | IS | 27.01.2018 | IE | 11.06.2018 | LU | 11.06.2018 | MT | 11.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 11.06.2009 | |
AT | 27.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PT | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
TR | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
MT | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
IE | 11.06.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
LU | 11.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
MC | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SI | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
PL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
DK | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
IT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 27.09.2017 | |
CZ | 27.09.2017 | ||
EE | 27.09.2017 | ||
ES | 27.09.2017 | ||
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
RO | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
SK | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
IS | 27.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 27.09.2017 | |
FI | 27.09.2017 | ||
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
NL | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
LV | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
BG | 27.12.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
GR | 28.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
HR | 27.09.2017 | ||
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
SE | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 27.09.2017 | |
LT | 27.09.2017 | ||
NO | 27.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 27.09.2017 | |
NO | 27.12.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6437811 (BATTLES AMY E [US], et al) [A] 7 * abstract * * column 4, line 40 - column 5, line 30 * * figure 2A *; | [A]US2002180763 (KUNG SHAO-TSU [TW]) [A] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 2-9 *; | [A]EP1557744 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022] * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2006036955 (BAUDISCH PATRICK M [US], et al) [A] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * figures 9, 10 *; | [Y]US2006132455 (RIMAS-RIBIKAUSKAS EMILY [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,14,15 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0077] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0088] * * figures 1, 2, 8, 9, 13, 14, 18, 19 *; | [Y]EP1736856 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0040] * * figures 8, 9A, 9B *; | [A]EP1835386 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] , [0 44] * * figures 2, 4a, 4b *; | [XAYI]US2007254722 (KIM HYUN H [KR], et al) [X] 9 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0050] * * figures 1, 5, 6, 7 * [A] 8 [Y] 10,11 [I] 12,13; | [I]AU2007101053 (APPLE INC) [I] 9,12,13 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0119] * * figures 7H-7J *; | [Y]US2008062141 (CHANDHRI IMRAN [US]) [Y] 11 * paragraph [0181] - paragraph [0190] * * paragraph [0200] - paragraph [0210] * * figures 23A-23H, 24, 26A-26E *; | [Y] - GONZALO RAMOS ET AL, "Pressure widgets", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS , CHI '04, New York, New York, USA, (20040424), doi:10.1145/985692.985754, ISBN 978-1-58-113702-6, pages 487 - 494, XP055208644 [Y] 1-8,14,15 * abstract * * column 1 - column 6 * * figures 1, 2a * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/985692.985754 | [A] - JUN REKIMOTO ET AL, "PreSensell: Bi-directional Touch and Pressure Sensing Interactions with Tactile Feedback", CONFERENCE ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS ARCHIVE. CHI '06 EXTENDED ABSTRACTS ON HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, ACM, US, (20060422), ISBN 978-1-59593-298-3, pages 1253 - 1258, XP007908748 [A] 1-8,14,15 * the whole document * | [A] - GONZALO RAMOS ET AL, "Zliding: Fluid Zooming and Sliding for High Precision Parameter Manipulation", UIST 05. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 18TH. ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY, (20051023), ISBN 978-1-59593-023-1, pages 143 - 152, XP002464850 [A] 9-13 * the whole document * |