EP2136353 - Pixel and organic light emitting display device using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 21.03.2012 [2012/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. San No.24 Nongseo-Dong, Giheung-Gu Yongin-City Gyunggi-do / KR | [2009/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Yang-Wan San 24 Nongseo-dong, Giheung-gu, Yongin-city Gyunggi-do / KR | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 09162891.7 | 17.06.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | KR20080056812 | 17.06.2008 Original published format: KR 20080056812 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2136353 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
G09G3/3233 (EP,KR,US);
H10B12/0335 (KR);
G09G2300/0819 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0852 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2300/0861 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2320/043 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Pixel und organische lichtemittierende Anzeige damit | [2009/52] | English: | Pixel and organic light emitting display device using the same | [2009/52] | French: | Pixel et dispositif d'affichage électroluminescent organique l'utilisant | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 22.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/12] | 06.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/12] | 28.10.2011 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005105031 (SHIH PO-SHENG [TW], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0045] - [0049]; figures 3a-b *; | [A]US2005206590 (SASAKI ISAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0089] - [0099] - [0128] - [0133]; figures 7,8,25 *; | [A]US2007115225 (UCHINO KATSUHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0133] , [0134]; figures 12a-b *; | [PA]EP1947633 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [PA] 1-10* paragraphs [0083] - [0126]; figures 8-12 * |