EP2136366 - Optical information recording apparatus, optical information recording method, optical information reproducing apparatus and optical information reproducing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.10.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 30.11.2016 [2016/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2-1, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [2013/37] |
Former [2009/52] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Yusuke Hitachi Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2009/52] | Representative(s) | Puschmann Borchert Kaiser Klettner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/28] | Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/52] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter Puschmann Borchert Bardehle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 12 31 80086 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09162969.1 | 17.06.2009 | [2009/52] | Priority number, date | JP20080161132 | 20.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008161132 | [2009/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2136366 | Date: | 23.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2136366 | Date: | 03.03.2010 | [2010/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/125, G11B7/0065 | [2009/52] | CPC: |
G11B7/128 (EP,US);
G11B7/1374 (US);
G11B7/0065 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/52] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufzeichnung optischer Informationen, Verfahren zur Aufzeichnung optischer Informationen, Vorrichtung zur Wiedergabe optischer Informationen und Verfahren zur Wiedergabe optischer Informationen | [2009/52] | English: | Optical information recording apparatus, optical information recording method, optical information reproducing apparatus and optical information reproducing method | [2009/52] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement d'informations optiques, procédé d'enregistrement d'informations optiques, appareil de reproduction/enregistrement d'informations optiques et procédé de reproduction/enregistrement d'informations optiques | [2009/52] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/52] | 01.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/48] | 23.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/48] | 14.07.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP13183626.4 / EP2674944 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003128324 (WOODS DANIEL D [US], et al) [I] 3-6,9 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2003185077 (ROH JAE-WOO [KR]) [X] 1-2,7-8 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,9; | [A]EP1457974 (INPHASE TECH INC [US]) [A] 4,6* the whole document *; | [XI]EP1550922 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1-2,7-8 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,9; | [I]EP1785987 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR]) [I] 3-6,9 * the whole document *; | [XI] - ASHLEY J J ET AL, "TWO-DIMENSIONAL LOW-PASS FILTERING CODES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19980601), vol. 46, no. 6, ISSN 0090-6778, pages 724 - 731, XP000779675 [X] 1-2,7-8 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/26.681399 | [XI] - HEANUE J F ET AL, "VOLUME HOLOGRAPHIC STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL OF DIGITAL DATA", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, WASHINGTON, DC, (19940805), vol. 265, no. 5173, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 749 - 752, XP001156237 [X] 1-2,7-8 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.265.5173.749 | [XI] - BERNAL MP ET AL, "Balancing interpixel cross talk and detector noise to optimize areal density in holographic storage systems", APPLIED OPTICS, (19980810), vol. 37, no. 23, pages 5377 - 5385, XP002550140 [X] 1-2,7-8 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/AO.37.005377 | [XI] - MARCUS B, Modulation codes for holographic recording" in Holographic data storage, H.Coufal, D.Psaltis, and G.T. Sincerbox, Eds., pp. 283-292, BERLIN, GERMANY, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2000), XP002550141 [X] 1-2,7-8 * the whole document * [I] 3-6,9 | Examination | WO9221125 | US2001024410 | EP1324323 | US2008117788 | by applicant | JPH09197947 | US2003128324 | JP2004272268 | WO2004102542 | EP1785987 |