EP2196504 - Method of making nanoscale particles of AZO pigments in a microreactor or micromixer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.08.2013 [2013/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20 A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2010/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Faucher, Santiago 219 Elderwood Trail Oakville Ontario L6H 5W2 / CA | 02 /
Carlini, Rina 2433 Robmar Dr. Oakville Ontario L6H 0B9 / CA | 03 /
Moore, Emily, L. 1186 Welwyn Drive Mississauga Ontario L5J 3J3 / CA | 04 /
Thompson, Christine 48 Warbeck Place Etobicoke Ontario M9R 3C3 / CA | 05 /
Gardner, Sandra, J. 1073 Harcroft Court Oakville Ontario L6H 3K5 / CA | 06 /
Gerroir, Paul, J. 2074 Searle Court Oakville Ontario L6L 1P9 / CA | 07 /
Allen, C., Geoffrey 8 Heathfield Crescent Waterdown Ontario L0R 2H5 / CA | [2010/24] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/24] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09163029.3 | 18.06.2009 | [2010/24] | Priority number, date | US20080166949 | 02.07.2008 Original published format: US 166949 | [2010/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2196504 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2196504 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C09B63/00, C09B67/20, C09B67/00, B01F5/06 | [2010/47] | CPC: |
C09B63/005 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09B67/0005 (EP,US);
C09B67/0091 (EP,US);
C09B67/0096 (EP,US);
C09D17/003 (EP,US);
B01F33/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/24] | C09B63/00, C09B67/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Teilchen von AZO-Pigmenten im Nanomassstab in einem Mikroreaktor oder Mikromischer | [2010/24] | English: | Method of making nanoscale particles of AZO pigments in a microreactor or micromixer | [2010/24] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de particules nanométriques de pigments AZO dans un microréacteur ou micromélangeur | [2010/24] | Examination procedure | 15.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 04.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/34] | 17.07.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.11.2013 | 05.11.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP1257602 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [ 0022]; example 3 *; | [YD]EP1905802 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [YD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0041] , [ 0107]; table 1 *; | [Y]JP2003026972 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1652893 (DAINICHISEIKA COLOR CHEM [JP]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2005097914 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * example s *; | [A] - PENTH B, "NEW NON - CLOGGING MICROREACTOR FOR CHEMICAL PROCESSING AND NANO MATERIALS", PROCEEDINGS. MICRO. TEC. VDE WORLD MICROTECHNOLOGIES CONGRESS,PROCEEDINGS OF INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICROTECHNOLOGIES, XX, XX, (20000101), vol. 1, pages 401 - 405, XP001058349 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6437104 | US6469147 | US6723138 | US2005109240 | US2008078305 | US2006194897 | US2003164118 | US2003158410 | US2007289500 | US2007213516 | WO2006132443 | US7160380 | US7262284 | US2002058794 | US2001029294 | US2003199608 | US6537364 | US5679138 | JP2007023168 | JP2007023169 | US2007012221 | - W. EHRFELD ET AL., Microreactors - New Technology for Modem Chemistry, I, WILEY-VCH, (2001), pages 5 - 11 | - HIDEKI MAETA ET AL., NEW SYNTHETIC METHOD OF ORGANIC PIGMENT NANO PARTICLE BY MICRO REACTOR SYSTEM, URL: http://aiche.confex.com/aiche/s06/preliminaryprogram/abstract 40072.htm | - K. BALAKRISHNAN ET AL., "Effect of Side-Chain Substituents on Self-Assembly of Perylene Diimide Molecules: Morphology Control", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2006), vol. 128, pages 7390 - 98 | - KAZUYUKI HAYASHI ET AL., "Uniformed nano -downsizing of organic pigments through core-shell structuring", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, (2007), vol. 17, no. 6, pages 527 - 530 |