EP2138311 - Fluid discharge device and method of controlling a fluid discharge device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamada, Manabu c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Urabe, Yuichi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2014/45] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
Yamada, Manabu c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suw Nagano 392-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Urabe, Yuichi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome, Suw Nagano 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/12] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09163677.9 | 24.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | JP20080167363 | 26.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008167363 | JP20080168954 | 27.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008168954 | JP20080243151 | 22.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008243151 | JP20090140009 | 11.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009140009 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138311 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2138311 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17566 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsablaufvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Steuern der Flüssigkeitsablaufvorrichtung | [2010/01] | English: | Fluid discharge device and method of controlling a fluid discharge device | [2010/01] | French: | Dispositif de décharge de fluides et procédé de contrôle d'un dispositif de décharge de fluides | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 08.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.06.2009 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | IT | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IE | 24.06.2015 | LU | 24.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.06.2009 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 24.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 24.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006038862 (TANNO RYUJI [JP]) [Y] 1-3,15 * paragraph [0042]; figures 1,4 * * abstract *; | [Y]US6145971 (BAKER RONALD WILLARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,15 * column 3, lines 39-52 * * column 4, line 34 - line 39 * * column 5, lines 1-5,50-60; figures 1,2a,2b,3a,3b *; | [A]US2005206698 (ALDRICH CHARLES S [US]) [A] 1-3,15 * paragraph [0020]; figures 2-4; claims 5,6,23,24 *; | [A]US6431694 (ROSS GRAHAM [US]) [A] 1-3,15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038]; figure 5 *; | [A]US5691754 (TA CHUONG C [US]) [A] 1-3,15 * column 2, lines 17-23,54-62; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2001028373 (IWAYA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,15 * abstract *; | [A]EP1038680 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1,15 * paragraph [0026]; figures 5-7 *; | [PA]EP2070705 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [PA] 1-3,15 * paragraphs [0030] - [0041]; figures 6,7 * | by applicant | JP2001071530 |