EP2138687 - Drive system with a rotary energy-transmission element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Griend Holding B.V. Griendweg 9 3295 KV 's-Gravendeel / NL | [2010/27] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states van den Brink, Anthonie Grote Riethure 10 3273 LC Westmaas / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van den Brink, Anthonie Grote Riethure 10 3273 LC Westmaas / NL | [2010/27] |
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2010/01] | Ketelaars, Maarten F.J.M. Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09163802.3 | 25.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | NL20082001721 | 25.06.2008 Original published format: NL 2001721 | NL20092002598 | 06.03.2009 Original published format: NL 2002598 | [2010/01] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2138687 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2138687 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02B63/04, F02B71/00, F02B75/26, F02B75/28, F01B3/04, F01B11/00, F01L11/00, F01L21/02, F01L21/04 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
F02B71/00 (EP,US);
F01B3/0094 (US);
F01B3/04 (US);
F01L11/02 (EP,US);
F02B63/04 (EP,US);
F02B71/04 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Antriebssystem mit einem Drehelement zur Energieübertragung | [2010/01] | English: | Drive system with a rotary energy-transmission element | [2010/01] | French: | Système de commande avec élément de transmission d'énergie rotative | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/27] | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.06.2009 | AT | 21.03.2012 | BE | 21.03.2012 | CY | 21.03.2012 | CZ | 21.03.2012 | DK | 21.03.2012 | EE | 21.03.2012 | FI | 21.03.2012 | HR | 21.03.2012 | LT | 21.03.2012 | LV | 21.03.2012 | MK | 21.03.2012 | MT | 21.03.2012 | RO | 21.03.2012 | SE | 21.03.2012 | SI | 21.03.2012 | SK | 21.03.2012 | BG | 21.06.2012 | NO | 21.06.2012 | GR | 22.06.2012 | IE | 25.06.2012 | LU | 25.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | IS | 21.07.2012 | PT | 23.07.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.06.2012 | ||
LU | 25.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
MT | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
BG | 21.06.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IE | 25.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
MK | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
DK | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.03.2012 | |
BE | 21.03.2012 | ||
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
PT | 23.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
SK | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
CZ | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
RO | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
SI | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
IS | 21.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
EE | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
SE | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 21.03.2012 | |
CY | 21.03.2012 | ||
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 21.03.2012 | |
FI | 21.03.2012 | ||
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
LV | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 21.03.2012 | |
HR | 21.03.2012 | ||
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | HR | 21.03.2012 | |
LT | 21.03.2012 | ||
NO | 21.06.2012 | ||
GR | 22.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 21.03.2012 | |
NO | 21.06.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5230307 (TANIGAWA HIROYASU [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-4,10 * column 3, line 39 - column 5, line 55; figures 1-3,5,10,11 * [Y] 6-8; | [X]NL1005155C (HOOGENBOOM BOB [NL]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 27 - page 5, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5799629 (LOWI JR ALVIN [US]) [X] 1 * column 10, line 66 - column 14, line 58; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2004231620 (CANNATA ANTONIO [CA]) [A] 1,3-4* paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [YD]WO2007126312 (STICHTING ADMINISTRATIEKANTOOR [NL], et al) [YD] 6-8 * page 6, line 25 - page 8, line 27; figure 1 * | by applicant | WO2007126312 |