EP2140942 - Product dispensing assembly to be attached to a bottle. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, Rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states L'Oreal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drugeon, Lionel 30 rue Voltaire 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | 02 /
Ponton, Thierry 76b rue de Reims 91700 Maisons Alfort / FR | 03 /
Riedinger, Vincent 4 Allée des Chevreuils 78390 Bois d'Arcy / FR | 04 /
Maire, Stéphane 8 rue de la Marne 94360 Bry sur Marne / FR | 05 /
De Raemy, Sylvain 10 Impasse de l'agriculture 95870 Bezons / FR | 06 /
Sickersen, Julien 12 rue des coutures 78410 Aubergenville / FR | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09163966.6 | 29.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | FR20080055468 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: FR 0855468 | US20080076953P | 30.06.2008 Original published format: US 76953 P | FR20090050044 | 06.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0950044 | [2010/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2140942 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2140942 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B05B11/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
A45D34/02 (EP,US);
B05B11/1077 (EP,US);
B05B11/1052 (EP,US);
B05B11/1047 (EP,US);
B05B11/1049 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einheit, die einen Verteilungskopf eines Produktes bildet, der geeignet ist, auf einem Fläschchen positioniert zu werden | [2010/01] | English: | Product dispensing assembly to be attached to a bottle. | [2010/01] | French: | Ensemble formant tête de distribution d'un produit propre à être supporté sur un flacon. | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/26] | 29.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003102279 (MICHAEL ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7,9-11 * abstract *[Y] 6,8; | [X]EP1464408 (REXAM BEAUTY & CLOSURES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,11 * abstract *; | [XY]US2005061834 (GARCIA FIRMIN [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0037] * [Y] 6,8; | [X]WO2007140238 (BAYER HEALTHCARE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,7,9-11 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2469356 | US4773553 | EP0653359 | US5762238 | FR2856994 | FR2897851 |