EP2141547 - Color Image Forming Apparatus and Control Method of the Same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.2014 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Business Technologies, Inc. 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2010/25] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Konica Minolta Business Corporation, Inc. 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Atsushi Konica Minolta Business Technologies, Inc 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | 02 /
Peng, Youbao Konica Minolta Business Technologies, Inc 1-6-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Alton, Andrew, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2010/23] | Brown, George Laurence Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2010/01] | Alton, Andrew Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09164142.3 | 30.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | JP20080175123 | 04.07.2008 Original published format: JP 2008175123 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2141547 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP2141547 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
G03G15/5062 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00063 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00067 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Farbbilderzeugungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Steuerung | [2010/01] | English: | Color Image Forming Apparatus and Control Method of the Same | [2010/01] | French: | Appareil de formation d'image en couleur et son procédé de commande | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/31] | 21.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/45] | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/48] | 30.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0772345 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,7-8 * column 7, line 6 - column 8, line 53; figures 4-7 * [I] 4-6; | [XI]EP1260877 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,7-8 * paragraph [0088]; figures 2,6 * [I] 4-6; | [XI]US2008056737 (FLEMMING RICHARD W [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7-8 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0017]; figures 3,4 * [I] 4-6 | by applicant | JP2008175123 | JPH10175330 | JP2001086297 | JP2006235490 | JP2003149903 |