EP2141266 - Silica glass crucible and method of pulling silicon single crystal with silica glass crucible [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Super Quartz Corporation 5-14-3 Barajima Akita City Akita 010-0065 / JP | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishi, Hiroshi c/o Japan Super Quartz Corporation 5-14-3, Barajima Akita-shi Akita 010-0065 / JP | [2012/13] |
Former [2011/49] | 01 /
Kishi, Hiroshi c/o Japan Super Quartz Corporation 5-14-3, Baraj Akita 010-0065 / JP | ||
Former [2010/01] | 01 /
Kishi, Hiroshi c/o Japan Super Quartz Corporation, 5-14-3, Baraj AKITA 010-0065 / JP | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2011/12] | Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2010/01] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09164154.8 | 30.06.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | JP20080170278 | 30.06.2008 Original published format: JP 2008170278 | JP20090150729 | 25.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009150729 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2141266 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2141266 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | [2010/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2141266 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C30B11/00, C30B13/14, C30B15/10, C30B35/00 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
C30B15/10 (EP,KR,US);
C30B11/002 (EP,US);
C30B13/14 (EP,US);
C30B35/002 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1032 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/01] | C30B15/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Quarzglastiegel und Verfahren zum Ziehen von Siliciumeinkristall mit dem Quarzglastiegel | [2010/01] | English: | Silica glass crucible and method of pulling silicon single crystal with silica glass crucible | [2010/01] | French: | Creuset en verre de silice et procédé de tirage de silicium monocristallin avec le creuset en verre de silice | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/26] | 14.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2009 | AT | 04.04.2012 | BE | 04.04.2012 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | DK | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | HR | 04.04.2012 | IT | 04.04.2012 | LT | 04.04.2012 | LV | 04.04.2012 | MK | 04.04.2012 | MT | 04.04.2012 | NL | 04.04.2012 | PL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SE | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | IE | 30.06.2012 | LU | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | FR | 02.07.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | NO | 04.07.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | ES | 15.07.2012 | IS | 04.08.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
LU | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
ES | 15.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
FR | 02.07.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
IE | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MK | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
IT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
DK | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 04.04.2012 | |
BE | 04.04.2012 | ||
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 04.04.2012 | |
CY | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
HR | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
PL | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
SE | 04.04.2012 | ||
NO | 04.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 04.04.2012 | |
NO | 04.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0530825 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 3, lines 34-47 *; | [A]US5306388 (NAKAJIMA TOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 1, lines 50-65 ** abstract *; | [AD]JP2005320241 (SHINETSU QUARTZ PROD) [AD] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]JP2008094639 (COVALENT MATERIALS CORP) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] * | by applicant | JP2002154894 | JP2005320241 |