EP2141299 - Sandwich panel and method of producing a sandwich panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unidek B.V. Scheiweg 26 5421 XL Gemert / NL | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Rie, Johnny Lucia Geraldine p/a Scheiweg 26 5421 XL, Gemert / NL | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Hooiveld, Arjen Jan Winfried Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 09164311.4 | 01.07.2009 | [2010/01] | Priority number, date | NL20082001759 | 04.07.2008 Original published format: NL 2001759 | [2010/01] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2141299 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2141299 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E04C2/38, E04C2/296, E04C2/292 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
E04C2/296 (EP);
E04C2/292 (EP);
E04C2/386 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | Sandwichplatte und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Sandwichplatte | [2010/01] | English: | Sandwich panel and method of producing a sandwich panel | [2010/01] | French: | Panneau en sandwich et son procédé de production | [2010/01] | Examination procedure | 07.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 11.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/52] | 06.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2012 | 31.07.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3782049 (SACHS M) [A] 6 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4163349 (SMITH GLENN W [US]) [A] 7 * column 3, line 6 - line 43; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO9534721 (NESTE OY [FI], et al) [A] 12,13 * figure 4 *; | [X]DE10134268 (FRANKIA FAHRZEUGBAU PILOTE GMB [DE]) [X] 1* figures 7,9,10; claim 5 *; | [X]DE10250665 (WEINMANN HOLZBAUSYSTEMTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0011]; figure 1; claims 1,2,4-10 * | Examination | EP0450731 |