EP2146185 - Method for intermixing graphics applications using display intermix server for cockpit displays [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krishna, Kiran Gopala Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Kar, Satyanarayan Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 03 /
Agasthyaraju, Vamsi Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 04 /
Ganganna, Shashidhara Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 05 /
Mathew, Bincicil Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 06 /
Hancock, William Ray Honeywell International Inc. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 07 /
Lopez, Dan Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Buckley, Guy Julian Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 09164357.7 | 01.07.2009 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | US20080172815 | 14.07.2008 Original published format: US 172815 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2146185 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2146185 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01C23/00 | [2010/03] | CPC: |
G01C23/00 (EP,US);
G06F9/541 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/03] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Mischen von Grafikanwendungen unter Verwendung eines Anzeigemischservers für Cockpitanzeigen | [2010/03] | English: | Method for intermixing graphics applications using display intermix server for cockpit displays | [2010/03] | French: | Procédé de mélange d'applications graphiques utilisant un serveur de mélange d'affichage pour affichages de cockpit | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/03] | 12.07.2011 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 21.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2011 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 16.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/29] | 02.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006103541 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0019] , [0035] , [0049]; figures 3, 5,10 * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0124] - paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0141] *; | [X]US2007005757 (FINGER JAMES C [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0115] *; | [X]US2002149599 (DWYER DAVID B [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * figures 1,2,4-6 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0015] - [0018] - [0021] - [0028] - [0030] * | [A] - "Windows Focus Policy Manager", IP.COM JOURNAL, IP.COM INC., WEST HENRIETTA, NY, US, (20060628), ISSN 1533-0001, XP013114749 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |