17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
28.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2017 [2017/22] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
22.07.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
04.03.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.04.2016 [2016/14] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
14.08.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.08.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.08.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
04.08.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.04.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.11.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.08.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.07.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.07.2014 |
First examination report |
|
03.08.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.07.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.08.2011 [2011/35] |
24.12.2010 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.01.2011 [2011/04] |
28.05.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
06.11.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |