EP2272778 - Storage device for piece goods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rowa Automatisierungssysteme GmbH Rowastrasse 1 - 3 53539 Kelberg / DE | [2011/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brokonier, Stephan Zum Sportplatz 11 54570 Neroth / DE | [2011/02] | Representative(s) | Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Gutenbergstraße 39 45128 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Zenz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Straße 2 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2011/02] | Zenz Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rüttenscheider Strasse 2 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09164464.1 | 02.07.2009 | [2011/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2272778 | Date: | 12.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2272778 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65G1/04 | [2011/02] | CPC: |
B65G1/0407 (EP);
B65G1/02 (EP);
B65G1/0435 (EP);
B65G2207/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/02] | Title | German: | Lagereinrichtung für Stückgüter | [2011/02] | English: | Storage device for piece goods | [2011/02] | French: | Dispositif de stockage pour marchandises au détail | [2011/02] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2011 | Examination requested [2011/14] | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.07.2009 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | HR | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | MK | 12.09.2012 | MT | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | SM | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | NO | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
MK | 12.09.2012 | ||
MT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
SM | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
SM | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CZ | 12.09.2012 | |
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
HR | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NO | 12.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | |
NO | 12.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DYA]DE20011661U (WAGNER RUDOLF M [DE], et al) [DY] 9-11 * pages 1-7; figures 1-4 * [A] 1; | [YA]JPS5235050 (TANAKA SAKUNAO) [Y] 9-11 * figures 1-13 * * Abstract * [A] 1; | [A]EP0847943 (SAWEAG AG SA [CH]) [A] 10 * columns 1-7; figures 1-7 *; | [A]EP1795464 (WINKLER WALTER [DE]) [A] 1,9 * columns 1-36; figures 1-28 * | Examination | AT410934B | FR2351032 | by applicant | DE20011661U |