EP2151345 - Fan and method for mounting a fan [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/06] | Mounting arrangement for a fan and method for mounting a fan | ||
[2012/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH C/IPE Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casagrande, Julien / Rheingoldstr. 6 77855, Achern-Sasbachried / DE | 02 /
Reith, Mario / Rehbuehnweg 1 77815, Buehl / DE | 03 /
Liedel, Markus / Kappelberg 5 91257, Pegnitz / DE | 04 /
Linnenbrock, Klaus / Praelat-Fischer-Str. 7 77815, Buehl / DE | [2013/01] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
Casagrande, Julien Rheingoldstr. 6 77855, Achern-Sasbachried / DE | ||
02 /
Reith, Mario Rehbuehnweg 1 77815, Buehl / DE | |||
03 /
Liedel, Markus Kappelberg 5 91257, Pegnitz / DE | |||
04 /
Linnenbrock, Klaus Praelat-Fischer-Str. 7 77815, Buehl / DE | Application number, filing date | 09165544.9 | 15.07.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | DE20081041078 | 07.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008041078 | [2010/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2151345 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2151345 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | [2010/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151345 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60K11/02, F04D29/52 | [2010/52] | CPC: |
B60K11/08 (EP);
F04D29/164 (EP);
F04D29/646 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/06] | B60K11/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/06] | Title | German: | Lüfter und Verfahren zur Montage eines Lüfters | [2012/41] | English: | Fan and method for mounting a fan | [2012/41] | French: | Ventilateur et procédé de montage dudit ventilateur | [2012/41] |
Former [2010/06] | Montageanordnung für einen Lüfter und Verfahren zur Montage eines Lüfters | ||
Former [2010/06] | Mounting arrangement for a fan and method for mounting a fan | ||
Former [2010/06] | Agencement de montage pour un ventilateur et procédé de montage dudit ventilateur | Examination procedure | 25.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/32] | 08.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.07.2009 | CY | 02.01.2013 | CZ | 02.01.2013 | DK | 02.01.2013 | EE | 02.01.2013 | FI | 02.01.2013 | HR | 02.01.2013 | IT | 02.01.2013 | LT | 02.01.2013 | LV | 02.01.2013 | MC | 02.01.2013 | MK | 02.01.2013 | MT | 02.01.2013 | NL | 02.01.2013 | PL | 02.01.2013 | RO | 02.01.2013 | SE | 02.01.2013 | SI | 02.01.2013 | SK | 02.01.2013 | SM | 02.01.2013 | TR | 02.01.2013 | BG | 02.04.2013 | NO | 02.04.2013 | GR | 03.04.2013 | ES | 13.04.2013 | IS | 02.05.2013 | PT | 02.05.2013 | GB | 15.07.2013 | IE | 15.07.2013 | LU | 15.07.2013 | BE | 31.07.2013 | CH | 31.07.2013 | FR | 31.07.2013 | LI | 31.07.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
MK | 02.01.2013 | ||
MT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
TR | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
GB | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
SM | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
GB | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
GB | 15.07.2013 | ||
IE | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
GB | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
FR | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
GB | 15.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
GB | 15.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.07.2013 | ||
LI | 31.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
MC | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
IT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 02.01.2013 | |
CZ | 02.01.2013 | ||
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
RO | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
SK | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
DK | 02.01.2013 | ||
EE | 02.01.2013 | ||
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
HR | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
PT | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
LV | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
FI | 02.01.2013 | ||
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
NL | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
GR | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
PL | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
ES | 13.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 02.01.2013 | |
LT | 02.01.2013 | ||
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SE | 02.01.2013 | ||
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
BG | 02.04.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 02.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 02.01.2013 | |
SI | 02.01.2013 | ||
NO | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19857926 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,12 * the whole document * [I] 3; | [A]WO2008074307 (TEMIC AUTO ELECTR MOTORS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,12 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 23 * * figure 3 *; | [A]JPS5946316 (TOYO RADIATOR CO LTD) [A] 1,12 * abstract * |