EP2151169 - METHOD FOR AFFIXING STRINGS OF ALPHANUMERIC CHARACTERS OR SYMBOLS ON FABRICS, STRINGS OF ALPHANUMERIC CHARACTERS OR SYMBOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/06] | Method for affixing strings of alphanumeric characters, symbols or the like on fabrics | ||
[2016/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metalworks S.p.A. Via Repubblica 24060 Castelli Calepio (BG) / IT | [2023/03] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states Metalbuttons S.p.A. Via Della Republica, 59 24060 Cividino (BG) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mongodi, Sergio Via Della Repubblica, 59 24060, CASTELLI CALEPIO BG / IT | [2023/12] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
Mongodi, Sergio Via Della Repubblica, 59 24060, CASTELLI CALEPIO BG / IT | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2023/12] |
Former [2010/06] | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli 16 20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 09165825.2 | 17.07.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | IT2008MI01509 | 08.08.2008 Original published format: IT MI20081509 | [2010/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2151169 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151169 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A41D27/08, G09F7/06 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
G09F7/06 (EP);
A41D27/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEFESTIGUNG ALPHANUMERISCHER ZEICHENKETTEN ODER SYMBOL AUF STOFFEN SOWIE ALPHANUMERISCHE ZEICHENKETTEN ODER SYMBOL. | [2016/45] | English: | METHOD FOR AFFIXING STRINGS OF ALPHANUMERIC CHARACTERS OR SYMBOLS ON FABRICS, STRINGS OF ALPHANUMERIC CHARACTERS OR SYMBOLS | [2016/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR L'APPOSITION DE BANDES DE CARACTÈRES ALPHANUMÉRIQUES OU SYMBOLES SUR DES TISSUS AINSI QUE BANDES DE CARACTÈRES ALPHANUMÉRIQUES OU SYMBOLES. | [2016/45] |
Former [2010/06] | Verfahren zur Befestigung alphanumerischer Zeichenketten, Symbole oder dergleichen auf Stoffen | ||
Former [2010/06] | Method for affixing strings of alphanumeric characters, symbols or the like on fabrics | ||
Former [2010/06] | Procédé pour l'apposition de bandes de caractères alphanumériques, symboles ou similaires sur des tissus | Examination procedure | 14.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.09.2011 | 31.07.2012 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.2012 | 31.07.2017 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   11.10.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 26.01.2017 | Stay of proceedings | [2017/13] | 26.01.2017 | Stay of proceedings | [2022/37] | 01.12.2022 | Resumption of proceedings | [2022/37] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.03.2023 | CZ | 22.03.2023 | DK | 22.03.2023 | EE | 22.03.2023 | FI | 22.03.2023 | HR | 22.03.2023 | LT | 22.03.2023 | LV | 22.03.2023 | MC | 22.03.2023 | NL | 22.03.2023 | PL | 22.03.2023 | RO | 22.03.2023 | SE | 22.03.2023 | SI | 22.03.2023 | SK | 22.03.2023 | SM | 22.03.2023 | NO | 22.06.2023 | GR | 23.06.2023 | GB | 17.07.2023 | IE | 17.07.2023 | LU | 17.07.2023 | IS | 22.07.2023 | PT | 24.07.2023 | BE | 31.07.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
GB | 17.07.2023 | ||
LU | 17.07.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
BE | 31.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/18] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
LU | 17.07.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/14] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
MC | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
CZ | 22.03.2023 | ||
DK | 22.03.2023 | ||
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SI | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
PL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SK | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
IS | 22.07.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
RO | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 22.03.2023 | |
EE | 22.03.2023 | ||
FI | 22.03.2023 | ||
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
SM | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
PT | 24.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
NL | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
GR | 23.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 22.03.2023 | |
HR | 22.03.2023 | ||
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
LV | 22.03.2023 | ||
SE | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 22.03.2023 | |
LT | 22.03.2023 | ||
NO | 22.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 22.03.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2187557 (FERRARIS LAUREN [FR]) [X] 5,7* figure - *; | [X]US6058573 (SILVER SAMUEL [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 27 - line 65; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | FR2187557 | US6058573 |