EP2209058 - Chargeable wireless mouse [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.12.2014 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primax Electronics Ltd 11F, No. 669, Ruey Kuang Road, 114 Neihu Taipei / TW | [2010/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Su, Chun-Nan 11F, No. 669, Ruey Kuang Road 114 Neihu Taipei / TW | 02 /
Wu, Chun-Che 11F, No. 669, Ruey Kuang Road 114 Neihu Taipei / TW | [2010/29] | Representative(s) | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/29] | Rees, Simon John Lewis Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 09166014.2 | 21.07.2009 | [2010/29] | Priority number, date | TW20090101489 | 16.01.2009 Original published format: TW 98101489 | [2010/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2209058 | Date: | 21.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2209058 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/26, G06F3/033, H01R13/62, H02J7/00 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
G06F3/03543 (EP,US);
G06F1/266 (EP,US);
H02J7/0044 (EP,US);
H01R13/6205 (EP,US);
H01R31/06 (EP,US);
H02J7/00 (US)
|
Former IPC [2010/29] | G06F1/26, G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wiederaufladbare Drahtlose Maus | [2010/42] | English: | Chargeable wireless mouse | [2010/29] | French: | Souris sans fil chargeable | [2010/29] |
Former [2010/29] | Aufladbare drahtlose Mouse | Examination procedure | 23.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/03] | 28.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03084004 (TWIN SAVER CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 4,5,8 * the whole document *; | [I]US2004252106 (KOH CHAO-MING [TW]) [I] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2006192757 (CHEN CHIH-CHIEN [TW]) [A] 9* paragraph [0026] *; | [A]KR20070116465 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 7 * abstract * |