Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
02.08.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.05.2011 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.08.2010 | Publication of search report | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
15.01.2010 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] |