EP2106989 - Vehicle device for preventing the leaving of the driving lane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2009/41] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1 Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Hiroaki Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
Kawakami, Seiji Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
Iwazaki, Katsuhiko Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
Rattapon, Chumsamutr Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2012/25] |
Former [2009/41] | 01 /
Kataoka, Hiroaki Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
Kawakami, Seiji Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
03 /
Iwazaki, Katsuhiko Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | |||
04 /
Rattapon, Chumsamutr Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | ||
Former [2009/41] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 09166359.1 | 26.05.2006 | [2009/41] | Priority number, date | JP20050156155 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: JP 2005156155 | [2009/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2106989 | Date: | 07.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2106989 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2106989 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62D6/00, B60R21/00, B62D5/04, G08G1/16, B62D15/02, B60W50/08 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
B62D15/025 (EP,US);
B62D15/029 (EP,US);
B60W30/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/43] | B62D6/00, B60R21/00, B62D5/04, G08G1/16 | ||
Former IPC [2009/41] | B62D15/02, G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/41] | Title | German: | Fahrzeug-Einrichtung zum Verhindern des Verlassens einer Fahrspur | [2009/41] | English: | Vehicle device for preventing the leaving of the driving lane | [2009/41] | French: | Dispositif de véhicule pour éviter la sortie d'une voie de circulation | [2009/41] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/41] | 03.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06766418.5 / EP1884449 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060766418) is 02.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19830548 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 3-6 * column 5, line 58 - line 60 * * column 8, line 36 - column 9, line 6; figure 1 * * column 9, line 58 - column 14, line 32; figures 2-5 * * column 19, line 11 - column 21, line 1; figures 10,11 * [Y] 1,2; | [Y]EP1531112 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029] - [0032] * | by applicant | JPH07105498 |