Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7892659 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2011 | B2 | US2010028718 | 04.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18287008 | 30.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2157207 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2010 | B1 | EP2157207 | 24.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US18287008 | 30.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE474945T | 15.08.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US18287008 | 30.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101638993B | 16.10.2013 | B | CN101638993 | 03.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US18287008 | 30.07.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602009000072D1 | 02.09.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US18287008 | 30.07.2008 |