EP2151649 - Household device with multiple compartments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/06] | Household device with multiple departments | ||
[2019/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2010/06] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Athanasiou, Athanasios Am Wildbad 13/1 89537 Giengen / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2010/06] | 01 /
Athanasiou, Athanasios Am Wildbad 13/1 89537 Giengen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09166956.4 | 31.07.2009 | [2010/06] | Priority number, date | DE20081041004 | 05.08.2008 Original published format: DE102008041004 | [2010/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2151649 | Date: | 10.02.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2151649 | Date: | 20.09.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2151649 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00 | [2010/06] | CPC: |
F25D29/00 (EP);
F25D2400/361 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2010/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Haushaltsgerät mit mehreren Fächern | [2010/06] | English: | Household device with multiple compartments | [2019/12] | French: | Appareil ménager doté de plusieurs compartiments | [2010/06] |
Former [2010/06] | Household device with multiple departments | Examination procedure | 31.07.2009 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 19.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2009 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | DK | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | ES | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | IT | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | NL | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.07.2009 | |
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
DK | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | EE | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | EE | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
IT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 11.09.2019 | |
ES | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002011072 (HIRAOKA TOSHIE [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0063] , [0 64] , [0 70] - [0072]; figures 1, 3, 4 *; | [XYI]KR20060120805 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-7,11-13 * page 4, lines 8-11, 29-32 * * page 5, lines 11-29 * * figure 1 * [Y] 4 [I] 8-10,14-16; | [Y]US2007044497 (ROO JIN S [KR], et al) [Y] 4* paragraph [0030] * |