EP2182727 - Mobile terminal and controlling method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2010/18] | For all designated states LG Electronics 20 Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ki, Jae Phil LG ELECTRONICS INC. IP GROUP 60-39, Kasan-dong, Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR | 02 /
Jung, Gu Wan LG ELECTRONICS INC.IP GROUP 60-39, Kasan-dong, Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2010/18] | Bethenod, Marc, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 09166979.6 | 31.07.2009 | [2010/18] | Priority number, date | KR20080106261 | 29.10.2008 Original published format: KR 20080106261 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2182727 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2182727 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/50, H04H60/25, H04L29/06 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H04N5/50 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04H60/25 (EP,US);
H04L65/611 (EP,US);
H04N21/26613 (EP,US);
H04N21/41407 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4405 (EP,US);
H04N21/4586 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US);
H04N21/4882 (EP,US);
H04N21/6131 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/18] | H04N5/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Steuerverfahren dafür | [2010/18] | English: | Mobile terminal and controlling method thereof | [2010/18] | French: | Terminal mobile et son procédé de contrôle | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 31.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 04.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/53] | 18.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/53] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]GB2407947 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [I] 1,3-15 * abstract * * page 9, line 6 - page 30, line 15 * * figures 1-13 * [Y] 2; | [I]WO2005045603 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [I] 1,3-15 * abstract * * page 15, line 22 - page 30, line 3; figures 1-18 * * figures 1-18 *; | [A]WO2006075900 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0132] * * figures 1-10 *; | [Y]EP1742394 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] - [0082] * * figures 4-9 *; | [A] - IPDC OVER DVB-H, "Electronic Service Guide (ESG) Implementation Guidelines", INTERNET CITATION, (200703), URL: http://www.dvb-h.org/PDF/a112.tm3586r5.ESG_Implementation_Guidelines.pd, (20070101), XP003019408 [A] 1-15 * sections 5.7-5.8 * | by applicant | GB2407947 | WO2005045603 | EP1742394 |