EP2153972 - Method for producing optical film, optical film, polarizer, optical compensatory film, antireflection film and liquid crystal display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states Fujifilm Corporation 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-0031 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takegami, Ryuta c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 02 /
Noritsune, Masahiko c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | 03 /
Hayashi, Naoki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210 Nakanuma Minami-ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-0193 / JP | [2010/07] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09167153.7 | 04.08.2009 | [2010/07] | Priority number, date | JP20080201288 | 04.08.2008 Original published format: JP 2008201288 | JP20090115420 | 12.05.2009 Original published format: JP 2009115420 | [2010/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2153972 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2153972 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C55/00, G02B5/30 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
B29C55/00 (EP,US);
G02F1/1335 (KR);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
G02B5/30 (KR);
G02B5/3083 (EP,US);
G02F1/13363 (KR);
B29C48/914 (EP,US);
B29C48/916 (EP,US);
B29C48/9165 (EP,US);
B29C48/917 (EP,US);
B29C48/919 (EP,US);
B29C55/06 (EP,US);
B29C55/08 (EP,US);
B29C55/143 (EP,US);
B29C55/146 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer optischen Folie, optische Folie, Polarisator, optische Kompensationsfolie, Antireflexionsfolie und Flüssigkristallanzeigevorrichtung | [2010/07] | English: | Method for producing optical film, optical film, polarizer, optical compensatory film, antireflection film and liquid crystal display device | [2010/07] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un film optique, film optique, polariseur, film optique compensatoire, film antireflet et appareil d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [2010/07] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 31.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP2003025414 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [AD] 1-17 * abstract *; | [XD]JP2007038646 (JSR CORP, et al) [XD] 1,7,8,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0064] , [0065] *; | [A]WO2007061083 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* figure 2; claims 1,2 * | by applicant | JPS51907073 | JPS5170316 | JPS54157159 | JPS5513765 | JPS5778431 | JPS60235852 | US4619956 | US4839405 | JPH03199201 | JPH0360532B | JPH05194789 | JPH05271471 | JPH06107854 | JPH06118233 | JPH06148430 | JPH06222213 | JPH06279546 | JPH0711055 | JPH0711056 | JPH0829619 | JPH08239509 | JPH09127885 | WO9728950 | WO9814499 | JPH10273494 | JPH10306175 | JPH11235747 | JPH11314263 | JP2000171635 | JP2000204173 | JP2000219752 | JP2000302988 | JP2001001745 | JP2001166144 | JP2001188128 | JP3194904B | JP2001270905 | JP3220478B | JP2001328973 | JP2002036332 | JP3273046B | JP2002167694 | JP2002311426 | JP2003012859 | JP2003025414 | JP2003066230 | JP3404027B | JP2003145609 | JP3428176B | JP2003215563 | JP2003248117 | JP2003292714 | JP2003344655 | JP2004070290 | JP2004070296 | JP3517471B | JP2004126546 | JP2004163924 | JP2004182979 | JP2004216717 | JP3559360B | JP2004291302 | JP2004292812 | JP2005189437 | JP3687231B | JP2005527696 | JP2005314534 | WO2005105918 | JP2005326613 | JP2005331728 | JP2006011361 | WO2006004376 | JP2006028993 | JP2006045500 | WO2006030797 | JP2006106386 | JP2006131898 | JP2006134872 | JP2006142800 | JP2006199788 | JP2006206881 | JP2006215463 | JP2006227630 | JP2006227090 | JP2006241433 | JP2006241263 | JP2006241197 | JP2006243216 | JP2006243681 | JP2006259313 | JP2006277914 | JP2006276574 | JP2006284703 | JP2006283013 | JP2006316181 | JP2006323069 | JP2006348123 | JP3867178B | JP2007011565 | JP2007010756 | JP3871721B | JP3873934B | JP2007038646 | JP2007051233 | JP2007063541 | JP2007065635 | JP2007070607 | JP3907908B | JP2007098917 | JP2007100044 | JP3912159B | JP2007113109 | JP2007113110 | JP2007118266 | JP2007128025 | JP2007138141 | JP2007140092 | JP2007171943 | JP2007176982 | JP2007178504 | JP3945598B | JP2007197703 | JP2007248780 | JP2007254726 | JP2007254727 | JP2007261265 | JP2007293272 | JP2007297615 | JP2007297619 | JP2007316366 | JP2007334307 | JP2008009378 | JP2008020891 | JP2008076764 | JP2008074918 | JP2008201288 | JP2008262187 | JP2008268939 | JP2009115420 | - JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (2005), vol. 98, page 016106 |