EP2282388 - Device for feeding in electrical energy of a number of strings of photovoltaic modules in an electricity network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMA Solar Technology AG Sonnenallee 1 34266 Niestetal / DE | [2011/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Falk, Andreas Neckarweg 38 34131 Kassel / DE | 02 /
Goldau, Jan Triftstrasse 4 34260 Kaufungen / DE | 03 /
Schulze, Gerold Fuchsgasse 3 34125 Kassel / DE | 04 /
Fischer, Jochen Holzweg 68 34255 Baunatal / DE | [2011/06] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/06] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Nikolausberger Weg 62 37073 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 09167414.3 | 06.08.2009 | [2011/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2282388 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02J1/10, H02N6/00, H02H3/16 | [2011/06] | CPC: |
H02J1/10 (EP,US);
H02H5/00 (KR);
G01R31/12 (KR);
H02J3/36 (KR);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Einspeisung elektrischer Energie von einer Vielzahl von Strings von Photovoltaikmodulen in ein Stromnetz | [2011/06] | English: | Device for feeding in electrical energy of a number of strings of photovoltaic modules in an electricity network | [2011/06] | French: | Dispositif d'alimentation en énergie électrique d'une multitude de chaînes de modules photovoltaïques dans un réseau électrique | [2011/06] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/06] | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH10201086 (NISSIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [A]JPH10285965 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 11 * abstract *; | [I]US2006237058 (MCCLINTOCK RONALD B [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0029]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2007048421 (CONERGY AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 5 * * claims 1,2,6,7,9,19 * * page 14, line 28 - page 15, line 5 * * page 23, lines 5-8 *; | [I]US2007107767 (HAYDEN HERBERT T [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 4 * * paragraphs [0014] - [0021] - [0 28] , [0036] , [0037] , [0040] , [0043] , [0046] , [0048] , [0049] , [0053] , [0055] - [0058] - [0061] - [0074] - [0082] *; | [A]US2008123226 (MCGINN PATRICK [CA], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] * |