EP2287691 - Device for accessing electronic vehicle components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2011/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schoppe, Peter Kuckuckstrasse 23 82237, Wörthsee / DE | 02 /
Hirsch, Thomas Dobelweg 19 73278, Schlierbach / DE | 03 /
Pasch, Martin Söflinger Strasse 226 89077, Ulm / DE | 04 /
Bühler, Rupert Hohenheimer Strasse 10/1 70771, Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 05 /
Schneider, Achim Hägelesweg 2 71154, Nufringen / DE | [2011/08] | Representative(s) | Bucher, Ralf Christian Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Pfarrer-Sickinger-Weg 122 85579 Neubiberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/08] | Bucher, Ralf Christian Patentanwalt Dipl.-Ing. Alte Landstrasse 23 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | Application number, filing date | 09167673.4 | 11.08.2009 | [2011/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2287691 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2011/08] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP);
G05B2219/25274 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/08] | Extension states | AL | 23.08.2011 | BA | 23.08.2011 | RS | 23.08.2011 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Zugriff auf elektronische Fahrzeugkomponenten | [2011/08] | English: | Device for accessing electronic vehicle components | [2011/08] | French: | Dispositif d'accès à des composants de véhicule électroniques | [2011/08] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/40] | 12.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.11.2014 | 26.11.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/18] | 18.12.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102006059630 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005] , [0011] , [0015] , [0018] , [0033]; figure 3; claim 4 *; | [X]DE102005011401 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * paragraph [0017] *; | [X]DE10237715 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,6,10 * paragraphs [0012] , [0014] , [0022] , [0023]; figure 3 * | [A] - "ASAM Schnittstellen", ELEKTRONIK INDUSTRIE, XX, XX, (19990101), vol. 9, pages 90 - 93, XP002291529 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE102006059630 |