EP2175254 - Arrangement for vibration monitoring of a rotating component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/18] |
Former [2010/15] | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dallinger, Frank Huttenstr. 23 70499, Stuttgart / DE | [2019/41] |
Former [2010/15] | 01 /
Dallinger, Frank Huttenstr. 23 70499, Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 09167797.1 | 13.08.2009 | [2010/15] | Priority number, date | DE20081042769 | 13.10.2008 Original published format: DE102008042769 | [2010/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2175254 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2175254 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2175254 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01M13/028, G01H1/00 | [2019/17] | CPC: |
G01M13/028 (EP);
G01H1/006 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/15] | G01M13/02, G01H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/35] |
Former [2010/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Schwingungsüberwachung eines rotierenden Bauteils | [2010/15] | English: | Arrangement for vibration monitoring of a rotating component | [2010/15] | French: | Arrangement de surveillance des vibrations d'un composant rotatif | [2010/15] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/35] | 08.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2019 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2009 | CY | 09.10.2019 | CZ | 09.10.2019 | DK | 09.10.2019 | EE | 09.10.2019 | ES | 09.10.2019 | FI | 09.10.2019 | HR | 09.10.2019 | IT | 09.10.2019 | LT | 09.10.2019 | LV | 09.10.2019 | MC | 09.10.2019 | MK | 09.10.2019 | MT | 09.10.2019 | NL | 09.10.2019 | PL | 09.10.2019 | RO | 09.10.2019 | SE | 09.10.2019 | SI | 09.10.2019 | SK | 09.10.2019 | SM | 09.10.2019 | BG | 09.01.2020 | NO | 09.01.2020 | GR | 10.01.2020 | IS | 09.02.2020 | PT | 10.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 13.08.2009 | |
CY | 09.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2019 | ||
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
MT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
MC | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SI | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
IT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
SK | 09.10.2019 | ||
SM | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
DK | 09.10.2019 | ||
EE | 09.10.2019 | ||
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
IS | 09.02.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 09.10.2019 | |
ES | 09.10.2019 | ||
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
RO | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
HR | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 09.10.2019 | |
FI | 09.10.2019 | ||
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
LV | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
PL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
GR | 10.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 09.10.2019 | |
LT | 09.10.2019 | ||
NL | 09.10.2019 | ||
SE | 09.10.2019 | ||
BG | 09.01.2020 | ||
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
PT | 10.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NL | 09.10.2019 | |
NO | 09.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | NL | 09.10.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3331252 (THOMAS GLEN H, et al) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [XI]US4144578 (MUELLER MARTIN, et al) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 30 - column 9, line 4; figures 1,2 * [I] 2-6,8-12; | [A]DE4215381 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,7* abstract * |