EP2166525 - Vehicle surrounding recognition support system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2015/12] |
Former [2010/12] | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagamine, Noboru Intellectual Property Department c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Kazuya Intellectual Property Department c/o AISIN SEIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2015/12] |
Former [2010/12] | 01 /
Nagamine, Noboru Intellectual Property Department c/o AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | ||
02 /
Watanabe, Kazuya Intellectual Property Department c/o AISIN SEIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2015/12] |
Former [2010/12] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09167811.0 | 13.08.2009 | [2010/12] | Priority number, date | JP20080242890 | 22.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008242890 | [2010/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2166525 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2166525 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
B60W50/08 (EP,US);
B60W30/18145 (EP);
G08G1/166 (EP,US);
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
B60W2050/143 (EP);
B60W2540/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/12] | Title | German: | Hilfssystem zur Fahrzeugumgebungserkennung | [2010/12] | English: | Vehicle surrounding recognition support system | [2010/12] | French: | Système support de reconnaissance des alentours d' un véhicule | [2010/12] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/12] | 29.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2009 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | IT | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | GB | 13.08.2015 | IE | 13.08.2015 | LU | 13.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.08.2009 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 13.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 13.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 13.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
GB | 13.08.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 13.08.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 13.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
IT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2000272414 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [DA] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]JP2004086524 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09132094 | JP2000272414 | JP3464368B |