EP2290476 - Isochronism corrector for a timepiece escapement and an escapement equipped with such a corrector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/09] | Isochronism corrector for a timepiece escapement and anescapement equipped with such a corrector | ||
[2013/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA - Recherche et Développement Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2002 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/09] | For all designated states CSEM Centre Suisse d'Electronique et de Microtechnique SA - Recherche et Développement Rue Jaquet-Droz 1 2002 Neuchâtel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Henein, Simon Avenue de Bellevaux 42 2000, Neuchâtel / CH | 02 /
Schwab, Philippe Crêts des Selles 1421, Grandevent / CH | [2014/17] |
Former [2011/09] | 01 /
Henein, Simon Avenue de Bellevaux 42 2000, Neuchâtel / CH | ||
02 /
Schwab, Philippe Crêts des Selles 1421, Grandevent / CH | Representative(s) | Bovard SA Neuchâtel Rue des Noyers 11 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | GLN SA Avenue Edouard-Dubois 20 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2011/09] | GLN Rue du Puits-Godet 8a 2000 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 09168113.0 | 18.08.2009 | [2011/09] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2290476 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2290476 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G04B15/12, G04B17/00 | [2011/09] | CPC: |
G04B15/12 (EP,US);
G04B17/00 (EP,US);
G04B17/045 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/09] | Title | German: | Isochronismuskorrektor für Uhrhemmungsmechanismus und mit einem solchen Korrektor ausgestatteter Hemmungsmechanismus | [2011/09] | English: | Isochronism corrector for a timepiece escapement and an escapement equipped with such a corrector | [2013/43] | French: | Correcteur d'isochronisme pour échappement horloger et échappement muni d'un tel correcteur | [2011/09] |
Former [2011/09] | Isochronism corrector for a timepiece escapement and anescapement equipped with such a corrector | Examination procedure | 31.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 29.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2009 | AT | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | HR | 23.04.2014 | IT | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | MK | 23.04.2014 | MT | 23.04.2014 | NL | 23.04.2014 | PL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | SM | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | NO | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IE | 18.08.2014 | LU | 18.08.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | BE | 31.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.08.2009 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.08.2009 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
LU | 18.08.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR648846 (PALMTAG, J) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]CH386935 (EBAUCHES SA [CH]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [DA]EP1736838 (SUISSE ELECTRONIQUE MICROTECH [CH]) [DA] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1736838 | EP20080101699 |