EP2169499 - High integrity perception for machine localization and safeguarding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Anderson, Noel Wayne 1241 1st Street North Fargo, ND 58102 / US | [2010/13] | Representative(s) | Holst, Sönke John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | Holst, Sönke Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 D-68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 09168307.8 | 20.08.2009 | [2010/13] | Priority number, date | US20080208691 | 11.09.2008 Original published format: US 208691 | [2010/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2169499 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2169499 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/00, G05D1/02 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
G05D1/0088 (EP,US);
G05D1/024 (EP,US);
G05D1/0242 (EP,US);
G05D1/0246 (EP,US);
G05D1/0255 (EP,US);
G05D1/0257 (EP,US);
G05D1/0261 (EP,US);
G05D1/0272 (EP,US);
G05D1/0274 (EP,US);
G05D1/0278 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/13] | G05D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/13] | Title | German: | Hochintegrierte Erkennung der Maschinenlokalisierung und Schutz | [2010/13] | English: | High integrity perception for machine localization and safeguarding | [2010/13] | French: | Perception à haute intégrité pour localisation et sécurité de machine | [2010/13] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 11.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1266552 (DEERE & CO [US]) [X] 1-8,16,17 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0014] - [0023]; figures 1-3 * [I] 9-15,18; | [XI]US2006190163 (ANDERSON NOEL W [US]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0031] - [0040] - [0081] - [0085]; figures 1,7-9 * [I] 18; | [A]US2008040023 (BREED DAVID S [US], et al) [A] 1-18* paragraphs [0169] - [0174]; figures 5,7,8,12a,17a * |