EP2133340 - Novel benzazepine derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Glaxo Group Limited Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sehmi, Sanjeet Singh GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | 02 /
Wilson, David Matthew GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 03 /
Witherington, Jason GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 04 /
Bamford, Mark James GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 05 /
Dean, David Kenneth GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park South Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | [2013/03] |
Former [2009/51] | 01 /
Sehmi, Sanjeet Singh GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park South Third Avenue Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | ||
02 /
Wilson, David Matthew GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | |||
03 /
Witherington, Jason GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | |||
04 /
Bamford, Mark James GlaxoSmithKline Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | |||
05 /
Dean, David Kenneth GlaxoSmithKline New Frontiers Science Park South Harlow, Essex CM19 5AW / GB | Representative(s) | Hillier, Mark, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2012/34] |
Former [2009/51] | Breen, Anthony Paul, et al GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN9.25.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 09168438.1 | 18.12.2003 | [2009/51] | Priority number, date | GB20020029820 | 20.12.2002 Original published format: GB 0229820 | GB20030012607 | 02.06.2003 Original published format: GB 0312607 | [2009/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2133340 | Date: | 16.12.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2133340 | Date: | 16.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D223/16, A61K31/55, A61P25/00 | [2009/51] | CPC: |
C07D223/16 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/55 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C07D401/12 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
C07D403/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/14 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/14 (EP,US);
C07D413/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/12 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/51] | Extension states | LT | 14.05.2010 | LV | 14.05.2010 | Title | German: | Neuartige Benzazepin-Derivate | [2009/51] | English: | Novel benzazepine derivatives | [2009/51] | French: | Nouveaux dérivés de benzazépine | [2009/51] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 20.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03785885.9 / EP1572215 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030785885) is 15.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.12.2003 | AT | 16.01.2013 | CY | 16.01.2013 | CZ | 16.01.2013 | DK | 16.01.2013 | EE | 16.01.2013 | FI | 16.01.2013 | MC | 16.01.2013 | NL | 16.01.2013 | RO | 16.01.2013 | SE | 16.01.2013 | SI | 16.01.2013 | SK | 16.01.2013 | TR | 16.01.2013 | BG | 16.04.2013 | GR | 17.04.2013 | PT | 16.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
TR | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
MC | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CY | 16.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
CZ | 16.01.2013 | ||
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
RO | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
SK | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
DK | 16.01.2013 | ||
EE | 16.01.2013 | ||
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
PT | 16.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
FI | 16.01.2013 | ||
NL | 16.01.2013 | ||
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
SI | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
GR | 17.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 16.01.2013 | |
SE | 16.01.2013 | ||
BG | 16.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | SE | 16.01.2013 | |
BG | 16.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0006254 (BIOPROJET SOC CIV [FR], et al) [A] 1-22 * example - *; | [A]WO0187834 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * example - *; | [PA]EP1283199 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-22* example - * | by applicant | GB1268243 | DE2207430 | FR2171879 | US4210749 | US5364791 | US5874534 | US5935934 | WO9955677 | WO0021951 | WO0023437 | WO0103680 | JP2001226269 | WO0187834 | WO0202530 | WO0214513 | WO0215934 | WO0240471 | WO02062423 | - LEURS, TRENDS PHARMACOL. SCI., (1998), vol. 19, pages 177 - 183 | - SCHLICKER ET AL., FUNDAM. CLIN. PHARMACOL., (1994), vol. 8, pages 128 - 137 | - ONODERA ET AL., The Histamine H3 receptor, ELSEVIER SCIENCE B.V., (1998), pages 255 - 267 | - GIOVANNI ET AL., BEHAV. BRAIN RES., (1999), vol. 104, pages 147 - 155 | - BIOORG.MED.CHEM.LETT., (2000), vol. 10, no. 22, pages 2553 - 2556 | - KENJI NIIYAMA ET AL., BIOORG. MED. CHEM LETT., (2002), vol. 12, no. 21, pages 3041 - 3054 | - TETRAHEDRON, (2000), vol. 56, no. 39, pages 7705 - 7713 | - EVANS, BRIAN J.; TAKAHASHI DOI, JOYCE; MUSKER, W. KENNETH, J.ORG.CHEM., (1990), vol. 55, no. 9, pages 2580 - 2586 | - A.E MOURAD ET AL., J. HET. CHEM, (1992), vol. 29, no. 6, pages 1583 - 1592 | - HUVAR, A. ET AL., MOL. PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 55, no. 6, pages 1101 - 1107 |